Myers v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Susan Myers
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2018cv00066
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. In accordance with the court's order entered December 28, 2018, that plaintiff's counsel be awarded fees under 28 U.S.C. § 2412 in the amount of $4,500.00 plus reimbursement of the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/28/2018. (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/21/2018. (Collins, S.)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/11/2018. (Collins, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Myers
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?