Ludlum v. United Food & Commercial Workers International Union et al
Plaintiff: |
Keith Alan Ludlum |
Defendant: |
United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Anthony M. Perrone and Alvin Vincent, Jr. |
Case Number: |
7:2018cv00090 |
Filed: |
May 25, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Southern Division Office |
County: |
BLADEN |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Labor Litigation |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 19, 2019 |
Filing
35
JUDGMENT - In accordance with the courts order entered April 19, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/19/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
January 14, 2019 |
Filing
32
ORDER denying 22 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint and to Close Case; denying 26 Motion to Strike; denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Where defendants have filed a motion to dismiss, good caus e appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities pending completion of briefing on the motion now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due with in 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendants' motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2019. (A certified copy of this order was sent via US mail to Keith Alan Ludlum, 8394 NC 131 Hwy, Bladenboro, NC 28320.) (Collins, S.)
|
November 2, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 13 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is ALLOWED to file an amended complaint no later than 21 days from the date of this order. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by that time, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/2/2018. (Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon Keith Alan Ludlum, 8394 NC 131 Hwy, Bladenboro, NC 28320) (Tripp, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?