Edwards et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emma McKellar, Robert Hunt, Dolores Hunt, Clifford McKellar, Jr. and Jimmy Edwards
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc., CSX Corporation and CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00169
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William F. Cash, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cash, William)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendants CSX Corporation and CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. ONLY, by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. (Ross, April)
October 31, 2018 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.. (Kitchin, Henry)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by April N. Ross on behalf of CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Ross, April)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Scott L. Winkelman on behalf of CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Winkelman, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
October 30, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #14 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiffs, it is ordered that Defendants shall have up to and including November 30, 2018, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/30/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Kitchin, Henry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kitchin, Henry)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Kitchin, Henry)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Danielle L. Perry on behalf of Jimmy Edwards, Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Emma McKellar, Clifford McKellar, Jr.. (Perry, Danielle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Gary E. Mason on behalf of Jimmy Edwards, Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Emma McKellar, Clifford McKellar, Jr.. (Mason, Gary)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Emma McKellar (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Clifford McKellar, Jr. (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dolores Hunt (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Hunt (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jimmy Edwards (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott C. Harris on behalf of Jimmy Edwards, Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Emma McKellar, Clifford McKellar, Jr.. (Harris, Scott)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew E. Lee on behalf of Jimmy Edwards, Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Emma McKellar, Clifford McKellar, Jr.. (Lee, Matthew)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of Jimmy Edwards, Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Emma McKellar, Clifford McKellar, Jr.. (Bryson, Daniel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Corporation, CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4664420.), filed by Dolores Hunt, Robert Hunt, Jimmy Edwards, Clifford McKellar, Jr., Emma McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons CSX Corporation, #3 Proposed Summons Summons CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Summons CSX Transportation, Inc) (Bryson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: April N. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Intermodal Terminals, Inc.
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: April N. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma McKellar
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hunt
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Hunt
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford McKellar, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Edwards
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Matthew E. Lee
Represented By: Scott C. Harris
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Danielle L. Perry
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?