Yates v. State Farm Casualty and Fire et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Graves Yates, III
Respondent: State Farm Casualty and Fire and Michael L Tipsord
Case Number: 7:2019cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 23 Notice to Pro Se Party Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Pro Se Party should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina. Case Number 4:18-cv-00179. Documents numbered 1 - 21, transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #19 Order adopting Report and Recommendation, placed in U.S. Mail to Jesse Graves Yates, III (along with contact information for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina, print out of web page,). (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting #8 Report and Recommendation and overruling Plaintiff's objections. Plaintiff's action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/3/19. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Notice Change of Case Number placed in U.S. Mail to Jesse Graves Yates III (abuc) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from Case Number 4:18-cv-00179-MGL to 4:18-cv-00179-DCC. (abuc) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Case Reassigned placed in U.S. Mail to Jesse Graves Yates III (glev, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis. Judge Honorable A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Judge A Marvin Quattlebaum, Jr. Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jesse Graves Yates, III from Jesse Graves Yates, III, 4308 Preacher Holmes Rd, Graham, NC 27253 **TO** Jesse G. Yates, III, Willow Run Condominiums 14a, 2000 Greens Blvd, Myrtle Beach, SC 29577. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendation by Jesse Graves Yates, III. Reply to Objections due by 3/20/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, #7 Order w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to Jesse Graves Yates, III, 4308 Preacher Holmes Rd, Graham, NC 27253. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is recommended that this case be transferred because venue is not proper. Objections to R&R due by 3/7/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/21/2018. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/21/2018. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]
January 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Casualty and Fire, Michael L Tipsord ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX400012953.), filed by Jesse Graves Yates, III. Service due by 4/23/2018.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 1/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. State Farm Casualty and Fire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Farm Casualty and Fire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael L Tipsord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Graves Yates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?