Faulkner v. Bathgate et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Faulkner
Defendant: George Bathgate and Western Hiways, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00007
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Marcus Faulkner. George Bathgate waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Ochsner, Ann)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Whitley on behalf of Marcus Faulkner. (Whitley, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. (Sellers, N.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann C. Ochsner on behalf of Marcus Faulkner. (Ochsner, Ann)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann C. Ochsner on behalf of Marcus Faulkner. (Ochsner, Ann)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by Marcus Faulkner Civil Cover Sheet. (Ochsner, Ann)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to George Bathgate, Western Hiways, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
January 9, 2019 Case transferred in from Western Division on 01/09/2019. Old Case Number 5:19-cv-8-D. (Sellers, N.)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:19-CV-7-D. No further filing shall be made in 5:19-CV-8-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/9/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 9, 2019 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
January 9, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by MARCUS FAULKNER (Ochsner, Ann)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4782434.), filed by MARCUS FAULKNER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Bathgate, #2 Proposed Summons Western Hiways) (Ochsner, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner v. Bathgate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Bathgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Hiways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Faulkner
Represented By: Ann C. Ochsner
Represented By: Robert E. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?