Norton v. Columbus County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Tyrone Norton
Defendant: Harold Fipps, Leslie Macrae Doless, Jr., Jerome McMillian, Columbus County Board of Elections, Giles E. Byrd, Jess Hill, Brenden Jones, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Scott Andrew Yates, Bonita Blakney, Red Dome Group, Inc., Trent Burroughs, James E. Prevatte, Jody Steadman Greene, Ricky Bullard, Edwin P. Russ, Amanda Prince, Charles McDowell, Tucker Ward, Carla Strickland, Lewis L. Hatcher, Joann Garrell, Western Surety Co. and Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00008
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 87 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Brenden Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 86 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lewis L. Hatcher (Blanks, Oscar)
March 8, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Strike #69 Notice of Appearance, #70 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss, #71 Memorandum in Support filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Sellers, N.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION to Strike #57 Response in Opposition to Motion, #38 Memorandum in Support, #58 Memorandum in Support, #37 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay regarding #33 Document, #8 Amended Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
March 8, 2019 Filing 83 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jody Steadman Greene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 82 Financial Disclosure Statement by Edwin P. Russ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 81 Financial Disclosure Statement by James E. Prevatte (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 80 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jerome McMillian (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 79 Financial Disclosure Statement by Charles McDowell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 78 Financial Disclosure Statement by Columbus County Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 77 Financial Disclosure Statement by Giles E. Byrd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 76 Financial Disclosure Statement by Trent Burroughs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 75 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ricky Bullard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service) (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 5, 2019 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Jody Steadman Greene. (Blanchard, Norwood)
March 4, 2019 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #70 MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 72 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #70 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 3/24/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 71 Memorandum in Support regarding #70 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenden Jones. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brenden Jones. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance filed by Danny Earl Britt, Jr on behalf of Brenden Jones. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave of Court to File in Hard Copy. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/28/2019. Sent to Danny Earl Britt, Jr. at The Britt Law Firm, PC, 107 North Court Square, Suite 22 Lumberton, NC 28360, Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr. at 296 Bladenboro Airport Road Bladenboro, NC 28320, and Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #66 MOTION for Leave of Court to File in Hard Copy. (Sellers, N.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 67 Certificate of Service filed by Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates regarding #61 Financial Disclosure Statement, #60 Notice of Appearance, #63 Notice of Appearance, #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint (AMENDED). (Williams, Kevin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave of Court to File in Hard Copy filed by Danny Earl Britt, Jr. on behalf of Brenden Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss) (Sellers, N.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #56 MOTION for Entry of Default, #54 MOTION for Entry of Default, #53 MOTION for Entry of Default, #55 MOTION for Entry of Default, #52 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Red Dome Group, Inc. answer due 3/28/2019; Scott Andrew Yates answer due 3/28/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/26/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 26, 2019 Filing 63 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Andrew Jones on behalf of Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Jones, Mark)
February 26, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
February 26, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint filed by Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Williams, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 61 Financial Disclosure Statement by Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates identifying Corporate Parent Red Dome Group, Inc. for Red Dome Group, Inc.. (Williams, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin G. Williams on behalf of Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Williams, Kevin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 59 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #63 . Notice of Appearance filed by Mark Andrew Jones on behalf of Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Jones, Mark) Modified on 2/26/2019 (Sellers, N.).
February 21, 2019 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support regarding #56 MOTION for Entry of Default, #54 MOTION for Entry of Default, #57 Response in Opposition to Motion, #53 MOTION for Entry of Default, #55 MOTION for Entry of Default, #52 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Bonita Blakney, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Jody Steadman Greene, Carla Strickland, Tucker Ward. (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 21, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #56 MOTION for Entry of Default, #54 MOTION for Entry of Default, #53 MOTION for Entry of Default, #55 MOTION for Entry of Default, #52 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Bonita Blakney, Columbus County Board of Elections, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Jody Steadman Greene, Carla Strickland, Tucker Ward. (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 20, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Joann Garrell filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Harold Fipps filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Carla Strickland filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Tucker Mack Ward filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Steadman Jody Greene filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #37 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay regarding #33 Document, #8 Amended Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiff's Request for Copy of Provisional Poll Book, #2 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal in Columbus County case 19CVS19, #3 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Steadman Jody Greene, #4 Exhibit 10 - Application for Use Value Assessment and Taxation, #5 Exhibit 11 - Application for Agriculture, Horticulture, and Forestry Present-Use Value Assessment, #6 Exhibit 12 - BP007: Public Information Individual Employee, #7 Exhibit 13 - Affidavit of Ricky Bullard, #8 Exhibit 14 - Columbus County Board of Commissioners Agenda and Backup - 12/03/18, #9 Exhibit 15 - Columbus County Board of Commissioners Agenda and Backup - 1/7/19, #10 Exhibit 16 - Columbus County Board of Commissioners Agenda and Backup - 1/22/19, #11 Exhibit 17 - Columbus County Personnel Action Form, #12 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jess Hill answer due 3/20/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/14/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Filing 48 Financial Disclosure Statement by Western Surety Co. identifying Corporate Parent Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
February 14, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond. (Sellers, N.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Respond filed by Jess Hill. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shields, Kathryn)
February 14, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathryn H. Shields on behalf of Jess Hill. (Shields, Kathryn)
February 13, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Whitfield Gibson on behalf of Western Surety Co.. (Gibson, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 44 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Andrew Scott Yates and Red Dome Group, Inc. on 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 43 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Brenden Jones on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Lewis L. Hatcher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Blanks, Oscar)
February 11, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Lewis L. Hatcher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Services) (Blanks, Oscar)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Self-Addressed, Stamped envelope, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #37 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay regarding #33 Document, #8 Amended Complaint. Response due by 3/1/2019. Sent to Calvin Tyrone Norton at PO Box 1145 Whiteville, NC 28472 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support regarding #37 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay regarding #33 Document, #8 Amended Complaint filed by Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Hill Protest to Bd of Elections, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B--Smith Protest to Bd of Elections, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C--Hatcher v. Greene lawsuit) (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 5, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay regarding #33 Document, #8 Amended Complaint filed by Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ. (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 4, 2019 Filing 36 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Brenden Jones on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Edwin P. Russ. (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 4, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Norwood P. Blanchard, III on behalf of Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners. (Blanchard, Norwood)
February 4, 2019 Filing 33 Document: Subpoenas to Bladen County Sheriff James Mcvicker, NC DMV, NC Department of Public Safety, SC DMV, and Columbus County Human Resource Director "Virginia Taylor" filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Sellers, N.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 32 Summonses Reissued at intake as to Bonita Blakney, Red Dome Group, Inc., Scott Andrew Yates. (Sellers, N.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 31 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on CCBOE by and through the Executive Director on 2/2/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 29 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Leslie Macrae Dowless, Jr. on 1/18/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 Affidavit of Service for Amended Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Leslie Macrae Dowless, Jr. on 1/22/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Western Surety dba CNA Surety Bonding Company on 1/29/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Jess Hill on 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr. filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton on 1/23/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ricky Bullard, Jerome McMillian, Edwin P. Russ filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
January 27, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Oscar M. Blanks, III on behalf of Lewis L. Hatcher. (Blanks, Oscar)
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Columbus County Board of Elections/ Department of Justice on 1/18/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Jess Hill on 1/18/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Trent Burroughs on 1/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Joann Garrell on 1/16/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Tucker Mack Ward on 1/16/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Harold Fipps on 1/16/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on James Prevatte on 1/16/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on P. Edwin Russ on 1/16/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Charles McDowell on 1/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Carla Strickland on 1/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Lewis Hatcher on 1/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Columbus County Board of Elections/ County Manager Mike Stephens on 1/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Jody Greene on 1/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton served on Amanda Prince on 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
January 22, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Sellers, N.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued at intake as to Bonita Blakney, Ricky Bullard, Trent Burroughs, Giles E. Byrd, Columbus County Board of Commissioners, Columbus County Board of Elections, Leslie Macrae Doless, Jr, Harold Fipps, Joann Garrell, Jody Steadman Greene, Lewis L. Hatcher, Jess Hill, Brenden Jones, Charles McDowell, Jerome McMillian, James E. Prevatte, Amanda Prince, Red Dome Group, Inc., Edwin P. Russ, Carla Strickland, Tucker Ward, Western Surety Co., Scott Andrew Yates. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Harold Fipps, #2 Summons as to Bonita Blakney, #3 Summons as to Commissioner Ricky Bullard, #4 Summons as to Commissioner Trent Burroughs, #5 Summons as to Commissioner as to Giles Byrd, #6 Summons as to Columbus County Board of Commissioners, #7 Summons as to Leslie Dowless, Jr., #8 Summons as to Joann Garrell, #9 Summons as to Jody Steadman Greene, #10 Summons as to Lewis Hatcher, #11 Summons as to County Clerk Jess Hill, #12 Summons as to Brenden Jones, #13 Summons as to Charles McDowell, #14 Summons as to Jrome McMillian, #15 Summons as to James Prevatte, #16 Summons as to Amanda Prince, #17 Summons as to Red Dome Group, Inc., #18 Summons as to Edwin Russ, #19 Summons as to Carla Strickland, #20 Summons as to Tucker Ward, #21 Summons as to Western Surety Bonding Co., #22 Summons as to Andrew Yates) (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL069191.), filed by Calvin Tyrone Norton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State of North Carolina Notice of Candidacy as to Steadman Jody Greene, #2 Exhibit 2- Columbus County Board of Elections Certificate of Election for Lewis Hatcher, County Sheriff 11/4/2014 General Election, #3 Exhibit 3- Disbursements Committee to Elect Jody Greene, #4 Exhibit 4- Copy of Transcript, #5 Exhibit 5- Oath of Sheriff, Steadman Jod Greene, #6 Exhibit 6- Copy of Warranty Deed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Columbus County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Fipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Macrae Doless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome McMillian
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus County Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles E. Byrd
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Hill
Represented By: Kathryn H. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenden Jones
Represented By: Danny Earl Britt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Andrew Yates
Represented By: Kevin G. Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonita Blakney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Dome Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin G. Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Burroughs
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Prevatte
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Steadman Greene
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Bullard
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin P. Russ
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Prince
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles McDowell
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis L. Hatcher
Represented By: Oscar M. Blanks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Garrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Whitfield Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Macrae Dowless Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Tyrone Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?