Vitale et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason R. Vitale and Joan Vitale
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 7:2019cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason R. Vitale, Joan Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Frost, Joseph)
February 27, 2019 TEXT ORDER AMENDING the February 27, 2019 Text Order granting the motion for extension of time to reflect that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including March 12, 2019, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/27/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
February 27, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #18 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendants, it is ordered that Plaintiffs shall have up to and including February 12, 2019, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #15 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/27/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason R. Vitale, Joan Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Frost, Joseph)
February 26, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have an additional day within which to serve their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint, this additional time to extend to and include February 5, 2019 and the pleading filed today by Defendants is hereby accepted. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/8/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Taylor, Nathan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Taylor, Nathan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) (Taylor, Nathan)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew W. Buckmiller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Buckmiller, Matthew)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Joan Vitale (Frost, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason R. Vitale (Frost, Joseph)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of Jason R. Vitale, Joan Vitale. (Frost, Joseph)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 2/4/2019; Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 2/4/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/16/2019. (Stouch, L.)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James C. Dever, III for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard no longer assigned to case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-9-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/16/2019. (Rudd, D.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Taylor, Nathan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC . (Taylor, Nathan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan J. Taylor on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Taylor, Nathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Matthew W. Buckmiller and Jospeh Z. Frost of Stubbs Perdue at 9208 Falls of Neuse Rd., Suite 201, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on January 15, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #3 Financial Disclosure Statement, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement - Financial Disclosure Statements were filed at case opening. Notice of deficiency issued in error. (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event "Notice-Other". Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Taylor, Nathan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association (Taylor, Nathan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC from Brunswick County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-2225. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4789945), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitale et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason R. Vitale
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Vitale
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Nathan J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Nathan J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?