Tull Hill Farms, Inc. v. CFG Financial Services, LLC et al
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc., CFG Financial Services, LLC, Bankruptcy Administrator, SP Funding, LLC. and Castellini Company, LLC
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Appellant: Tull Hill Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00018
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/18/2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 Appellant's of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Docket of Bankruptcy Court Proceeding) (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Chapter 11 Petition filed 1/21/18, #2 Debtor's Declaration, Summary of Schedules and all Schedules and Statements filed 1/30/2018, #3 Consent Order Establishing Exclusive Procedures for the Assertion, Resolution, and Satisfaction of Claims Arising Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act filed 3/5/2018, #4 Tull Hill Farms' PACA Proof of Claim filed 4/16/18, #5 CFG Financial Services, LLC Objection to PACA Claim filed 5/15/2018, #6 Castellini Company, LLC and SP Funding, LLC's Omnibus Objections to Asserted PACA Claims filed 6/4/2018, #7 Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No 89 filed 6/4/2018, #8 Response of Tull Hill Farms, to CFG Financial Services, LLC's Objection to PACA Proof of Claim No. 81 filed 6/18/2018, #9 Supplemental Response of Tull hill Farms, Inc. to CFG Financial Services, LLC's Objection to PACA Proof of Claim No. 89 filed 6/29/2018, #10 Response of Tull Hill Farms, Inc. to Omnibus Claim Objections of Castellini Company, LLC and SP Funding, LLC filed 6/29/2018, #11 Response of Tull Hill Farms, Inc. to Debtor's Objection to PACA Proof of Claim No. 89 filed 6/29/2018, #12 Debtor's First Amended Disclosure Statement filed 6/29/2018, #13 Order Confirming First Amended Plan of Reorganization filed 10/2/2018, #14 Post-Hearing Memorandum of Tull Hill Farms, Inc. filed 11/07/2018, #15 Post-Hearing Brief of CFG Financial Services, LLC in Support filed 11/26/2018, #16 Order Allowing Objections to PACA Claim of Tull Hill Farms, Inc. Filed 1/23/2019, #17 Tull Hill Farms, Inc. Notice of Appeal filed 2/1/2019) (McNeill, A)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by CFG Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carolina Financial Group, LLC, Corporate Parent CFG Holdings, Inc. for CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Cournoyer, John)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Tull Hill Farms, Inc. (Haidt, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by David J. Haidt on behalf of Tull Hill Farms, Inc.. (Haidt, David)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Nerhood on behalf of Castellini Company, LLC, SP Funding, LLC.. (Nerhood, Timothy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by John Paul Cournoyer on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Cournoyer, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by John A. Northen on behalf of CFG Financial Services, LLC. (Northen, John)
February 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00284-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse filed January 23, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tull Hill Farms, Inc. v. CFG Financial Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Byrd Crampton
Represented By: Steven Craig Newton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CFG Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: John A. Northen
Represented By: John Paul Cournoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bankruptcy Administrator
Represented By: Brian Charles Behr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SP Funding, LLC.
Represented By: Timothy Nerhood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Castellini Company, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Nerhood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tull Hill Farms, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Haidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?