Millstream Farming, LLC v. Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Appellant: Millstream Farming, LLC
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 7:2019cv00021
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/31/2018, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc.. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Appellant's of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 PACA Proof of Claim Form filed 4/13/2018, #2 Proof of Claim Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Claim Exhibit 2, #4 Proof of Claim Exhibit 3, #5 Proof of Claim Exhibit 4, #6 Proof of Claim Exhibit 5, #7 Proof of Claim Exhibit 6, #8 Proof of Claim Exhibit 7, #9 Proof of Claim Exhibit 8, #10 Proof of Claim Exhibit 9, #11 Proof of Claim Exhibit 10, #12 Proof of Claim Exhibit 11, #13 Proof of Claim Exhibit 12, #14 Proof of Claim Exhibit 13, #15 Proof of Claim Exhibit 14, #16 Docket from Bankruptcy Proceedings) (McNeill, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A and B to Amended Designations, #2 Debtor's Chapter 11 Petition filed 1/21/18, #3 Debtor's Motion to Establish Exclusive Procedures for the Assertion, Resolution, and Satisfaction of Claims Arising Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act filed 2/9/18, #4 Consent Order Establishing Exclusive Procedure for the Assertion, Resolution, and Satisfaction of Claims Arising Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act filed 3/5/2018, #5 Ex Parte Order Extending Time within which to Object to PACA Proofs of Claim filed 5/10/2018, #6 Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No. 80 filed by Millstream Farming, LLC filed 6/6/18, #7 Millstream Farming, LLC's Response to Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No. 80 filed 6/29/2018, #8 Order Allowing Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No. 80 filed by Millstream Farming, LLC filed 1/8/2019, #9 Millstream Farming, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Notice of Appeal from January 8, 2019 Order Allowing Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No. 80 filed 1/16/2019, #10 Order Granting Millstream Farming, LLC's Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Notice of Appeal From January 8, 2019 Order Allowing Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim No. 80 filed 1/18/209, #11 Millstream Farming, LLC's Notice of Appeal from January 8, 2019 Order Allowing Debtor's Objection to PACA Claim no. 80 filed 2/5/2019, #12 Docket From Bankruptcy Proceeding) (McNeill, A)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wayne Bailey, Inc. (Crampton, Gregory)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Craig Newton, II on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Newton, Steven)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory Byrd Crampton on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Crampton, Gregory)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Luther Donald Starling, Jr on behalf of Millstream Farming, LLC. (Starling, Luther)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Millstream Farming, LLC (Parrish, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by James Michael Fields on behalf of Millstream Farming, LLC. (Fields, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of Millstream Farming, LLC. (Parrish, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00284-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse filed January 8, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millstream Farming, LLC v. Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Byrd Crampton
Represented By: Steven Craig Newton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Millstream Farming, LLC
Represented By: James Michael Fields
Represented By: Luther Donald Starling, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?