Arramreddy v. Branch Banking & Trust Company

Plaintiff: Raghu Arramreddy
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00033
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Consolidate Cases; finding as moot 31 Motion to Stay. A master docket and master file shall be established for the above-captioned cases. The master file shall be case no. 5:18-CV-210-FL. All future filings shall be made in that file and bear the specified caption. The clerk is DIRECTED to note all previous entries from case number 7:19-CV-33-FL on the master docket and to file them in the master file. Where several of the case management deadlines ordered in case no. 5:18-CV-210-FL (DE 17, 20), have or soon will expire, the parties shall file any proposed amendment(s) to the courts prior orders on scheduling (5:18-CV-210-FL #17 #20 ) on or before April 5, 2019. If no amendment timely is proposed, the schedule previously ordered shall govern this consolidated action. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/21/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Raghu Shashank Arramreddy, 4001 Des Planes Ave., Fayetteville, NC 28306.) (Collins, S.)
March 20, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #25 MOTION to Stay, #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Collins, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 28 Proposed Order regarding #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #25 MOTION to Stay filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
March 20, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed Order regarding #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #25 MOTION to Stay filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #25 Motion to Stay, #23 Motion to Consolidate Cases. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. (Collins, S.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support regarding #25 MOTION to Stay filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
February 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Stay filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
February 21, 2019 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support regarding #23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
February 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
February 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Stricklin, Jill)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-33-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/15/2019. Copy mailed via US Mail to Raghu Arramreddy at 4001 Des Plaines Avenue, Fayetteville, NC 28306 and defense counsel, Jenna M Bedsole and Daisy Christina Karlson of Baker Donelson at 420 20th Street North, Suite 1400, Birmingham, AL 35203 mailed via US Mail on February 19, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 Notice to Pro Se Party and Defense counsel Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. The parties should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern. Case Number 4:18-cv-00763. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of North Carolina (GRANTING MOTION doc #16 ); original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be mailed to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date; and GRANTING MOTION doc #17 , Attorney Anthony David Michel terminated. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/25/2019. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
December 28, 2018 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anthony Michel by Raghu Arramreddy (found within doc #17 . (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Support re #16 MOTION re #1 Complaint Defendant's Motion to Transfer AND THE UNDERSIGNED'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW filed by Raghu Arramreddy. (Michel, Anthony) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Transfer Case to ED/NC re #1 Complaint by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Karlson, Daisy) Modified on 12/21/2018 (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins (Birmingham): Telephone Conference held on 12/6/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Status Report filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company. A telephone conference in the above-styled cause is set for Thursday, December 6, 2018, at 12:30 P.M. Parties are to call 877-402-9757 (ACCESS #4216828) five minutes prior to start of conference. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/3/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT'S STATUS REPORT by Branch Banking & Trust Company. filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karlson, Daisy) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Branch Banking & Trust Company. filed by Branch Banking & Trust Company (Karlson, Daisy) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Before the Court is Defendant Branch Banking and Trust Companys (BB&T) Motion To Stay (the Motion). (Doc. 11). Plaintiff Raghu Arramreddy never responded. (See CM/ECF). The Motion is GRANTED. The Defendant is ORDERED to advise the Court of any action taken by the court in North Carolina. Further, the Defendant is ORDERED to file a status report with this Court on September 1, 2018, and every 90 days thereafter while the stay is pending. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/31/2018. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Karlson, Daisy) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response due by 7/12/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/26/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Responsive Pleading by Branch Banking & Trust Company. (Karlson, Daisy) Modified on 6/26/2018 (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M Bedsole on behalf of Branch Banking & Trust Company (Bedsole, Jenna) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daisy Christina Karlson on behalf of Branch Banking & Trust Company (Karlson, Daisy) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raghu Arramreddy. Branch Banking & Trust Company served on 5/31/2018, answer due 6/21/2018. (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Branch Banking & Trust Company via certified U.S. Mail on this the 29th day of May, 2018. (Certified Mail Request filed within Complaint) (JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/22/2018. (KWC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raghu Arramreddy. filed by Raghu Arramreddy (Michel, Anthony) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3092349, NDAL receipt #B4601089153. (Michel, Anthony) Modified on 5/22/2018 (JLC). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Branch Banking & Trust Company, filed by Raghu Arramreddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JLC) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 2/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arramreddy v. Branch Banking & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raghu Arramreddy
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Represented By: Jenna M Bedsole
Represented By: Daisy Christina Karlson
Represented By: Jill S. Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?