Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company v. Ortez et al
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Luis J. Ortez, Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc. and Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes
Case Number: 7:2019cv00059
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company (Keister, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 19 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company served on Luis J. Ortez on 04/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Keister, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company served on Theresa Beddard Estes on 04/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Keister, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #16 filed by Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes and the unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #17 filed by Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these Defendants have up to and including June 10, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #14 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/30/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #14 Amended Complaint filed by Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Merritt, Walter)
April 30, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #14 Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #14 Amended Complaint filed by Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Extension) (Abrams, Noah)
April 29, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Luiz J. Ortez's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #15 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including June 10, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #14 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/29/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
April 29, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #14 Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #14 Amended Complaint filed by Luis J. Ortez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension) (Stradley, J.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit B-Craven Co Complaint) (Keister, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Answer filed by Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes. (Abrams, Noah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Answer filed by Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes. (Abrams, Noah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and ANSWER filed by Luis J. Ortez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Ortez, et al. v. Penn National Security Insurance Company, #2 Exhibit Printout of Pa. Dept. of Ins. website) (Stradley, J.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and ANSWER filed by Luis J. Ortez. (Stradley, J.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by J. David Stradley on behalf of Luis J. Ortez. (Stradley, J.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Noah Breen Abrams on behalf of Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes. (Abrams, Noah)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc. (Merritt, Walter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc.. Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc. waiver sent on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Merritt, Walter)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Walter G. Merritt on behalf of Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc.. (Merritt, Walter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey D. Keister on behalf of Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc., Luis J. Ortez, Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 21, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Pennsylvania National Mutual Casual Insurance Company for Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company. (Keister, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4875050.), filed by Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Craven Co Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Summons-Ortez, #5 Proposed Summons Summons-Kitchen, #6 Proposed Summons Summons-Estes) (Keister, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company v. Ortez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis J. Ortez
Represented By: J. David Stradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitchen and Lighting Designs Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Walter G. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Beddard Estes as Administratrix of the Estate of Darren Drake Estes
Represented By: Noah Breen Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?