Revel's Barbecue of North Carolina, Inc. v. Cartrette

Plaintiff: Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. and Revel's Barbecue of North Carolina, Inc.
Defendant: Wylie F. Cartrette
Case Number: 7:2019cv00094
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #15 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including July 10, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/5/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
June 5, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by Wylie F. Cartrette. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bowman, Marla)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Revel's Barbecue of North Carolina, Inc. served on Wylie F Cartrette on 5/20/2019. (Wharton, Jacob)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph A. Schouten on behalf of Wylie F. Cartrette. (Schouten, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wylie F. Cartrette (Bowman, Marla)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Marla Spector Bowman on behalf of Wylie F. Cartrette. (Bowman, Marla)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Wylie F. Cartrette. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by John D. Wooten, IV on behalf of Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc.. (Wooten, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice filed by Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. regarding #1 Complaint,, Proposed Summons. (Wharton, Jacob)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacob S. Wharton on behalf of Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc.. (Wharton, Jacob)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. regarding #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Wharton, Jacob)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. (Wharton, Jacob)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wylie F. Cartrette. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 TRADEMARK REPORT - Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on May 14, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the Proposed Summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc. regarding #1 Complaint,, Proposed Summons. (Wharton, Jacob) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 5/14/2019) (Edwards, S.).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wylie F. Cartrette ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4941482.), filed by Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - REVEL'S - NC State Registration, #2 Exhibit B - US Trademark Appl'n No. 88193493, #3 Exhibit C -2019.03.19 Ltr to Bullard from Martin, #4 Exhibit D - 2019.03.19 Ltr to Brookwood from Martin, #5 Exhibit E - 2019.04.12 Ltr P Jeff Martin, #6 Exhibit F - US Trademark Appl'n No. 88329985) (Wharton, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revel's Barbecue of North Carolina, Inc. v. Cartrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revel's Barbeque of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob S. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revel's Barbecue of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob S. Wharton
Represented By: John D. Wooten, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wylie F. Cartrette
Represented By: Marla Spector Bowman
Represented By: Joseph A. Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?