Stanley v. Ashland LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carl Stanley
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Daniel International Corporation, Covil Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Peerless Industries, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Ashland LLC, General Electric Company, International Paper Company, Hercules LLC, A.W. Chesterton, Champlain Cable Corporation, CBS Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation and Peerless Heater Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00099
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/23/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Foster Wheeler LLC served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
August 2, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Champlain Cable Corporation. (Rubel, Douglas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 70 Financial Disclosure Statement by Champlain Cable Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CC Acquisition Corp. for Champlain Cable Corporation. (Shofner, Erin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 69 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Champlain Cable Corporation. (Shofner, Erin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 68 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ruth F. Maron on behalf of International Paper Company. (Maron, Ruth)
August 2, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #67 Notice of Special Appearance. #40 Notice of Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 67 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark A. Leach on behalf of International Paper Company. (Leach, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 66 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carl Stanley as to Peerless Industries, Inc.. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 65 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Union Carbide Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Riley Power, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 63 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carl Stanley as to Peerless Heater Company. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. International Paper Company served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Hercules LLC served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. General Electric Company served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Daniel International Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Covil Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Champlain Cable Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Certainteed Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. CBS Corporation served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl Stanley. Ashland LLC served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Black, Janet Ward)
July 23, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles P. Stern on behalf of Carl Stanley. (Stern, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance filed by Erin M. Wood on behalf of Carl Stanley. (Wood, Erin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Carl Stanley as to Foster Wheeler LLC. (Black, Janet Ward) Modified on 7/18/2019 to correct docket entry text (Stouch, L.).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #6 Amended Complaint. Champlain Cable Corporation answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/18/2019. (Stouch, L.)
July 18, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #6 Amended Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #6 Amended Complaint filed by Champlain Cable Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shofner, Erin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Erin Elaine Shofner on behalf of Champlain Cable Corporation. (Shofner, Erin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph D. Hammond on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Hammond, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance filed by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Shipley, Curtis)
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
July 9, 2019 Filing 42 Financial Disclosure Statement by Covil Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Covil Corporation. (Packer, Leslie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Covil Corporation. (Packer, Leslie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company (Leach, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Leach on behalf of International Paper Company. (Leach, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by International Paper Company. (Leach, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 Financial Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 Financial Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of CBS Corporation. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Company. (Techman, Jennifer)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Dell P. Chappell on behalf of E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Chappell, Dell)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Erin Elaine Shofner on behalf of Hercules LLC, Riley Power, Inc.. (Shofner, Erin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Riley Power, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Riley Power, Inc.. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hercules LLC (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company (Tomlin, Tracy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Tomlin, Tracy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy E. Tomlin on behalf of E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company. (Tomlin, Tracy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Scott E. Frick on behalf of Certainteed Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (Frick, Scott)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by William David Conner on behalf of Certainteed Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (Conner, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Moffatt G. McDonald on behalf of Certainteed Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (McDonald, Moffatt)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Certainteed Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation (Major, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Certainteed Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Daniel International Corporation. (Major, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Peerless Heater Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carl Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Black, Janet Ward)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to A.W. Chesterton, Ashland LLC, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Champlain Cable Corporation, Covil Corporation, Daniel International Corporation, E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hercules LLC, International Paper Company, Peerless Industries, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Audrey Snyder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snyder, Audrey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Carl Stanley (Black, Janet Ward)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Black, Janet Ward)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4948878.), filed by Carl Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit asbestos exposed individual, #2 Exhibit employment history, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Black, Janet Ward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Ashland LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Represented By: Dell P. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher Barton Major
Represented By: William David Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Mark A. Leach
Represented By: Ruth F. Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules LLC
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Corporation
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Represented By: Erin Elaine Shofner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Heater Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Stanley
Represented By: Audrey Snyder
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Erin M. Wood
Represented By: Charles P. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?