Hill v. United States Postal Service

Petitioner: Daniel C. Hill
Respondent: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 7:2019cv00113
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to Pro Se Party Regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. The parties should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Mandate issued to the Merit Systems Protection Board. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 595179 [PBC] [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:33 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER filed. The stay of the briefing schedule is lifted. The petition and all filings are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Each side shall bear its own costs. (Per Curiam). Service: 01/31/2019 by clerk. 582314 [LS] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:41 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 (Document construed as) RESPONSE of Petitioner Daniel C. Hill to the court order to show cause #10 , court order #10 . Service: 01/23/2019 by clerk. 580278 [SMJ] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:50 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE of Respondent USPS to the court order to show cause #10 , court order #10 . Service: 12/20/2018 by US mail, email. 573452 [18-2175] [Russell Upton] [Entered: 12/20/2018 11:00 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER filed. The parties are directed to show cause, within 21 days of the date of filing of this order, why this petition should not be construed as seeking review of a mixed case and transferred to the appropriate district court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (Per Curiam). Service: 12/14/2018 by clerk. 571872 [NEL] [Entered: 12/14/2018 01:22 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE of Respondent USPS to the court order #8 , court order #8 . Service: 10/25/2018 by US mail, email. 560302 [18-2175] [Russell Upton] [Entered: 10/25/2018 10:05 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed. The parties are directed to show cause, within 60 days of the date of filing of this order, why this petition for review as to the Board's decision should not be dismissed and whether the petition should be construed as seeking review of the EEOC decision. Mr. Hill's motion for an extension of time #5 is denied as moot. The briefing schedule is stayed. (Per Curiam). Service: 09/12/2018 by clerk. 549074 [LS] [Entered: 09/12/2018 09:51 AM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 Entry of appearance for Russell J. Upton as principal counsel for Respondent USPS. Service: 08/06/2018 by email, US mail. 540868 [18-2175] [Russell Upton] [Entered: 08/06/2018 10:40 AM [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Certified list from the Merit Systems Protection Board. Service: 07/31/2018 by US mail. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 08/24/2018. 539780 [SMJ] [Entered: 07/31/2018 02:40 PM [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION of Petitioner Daniel C. Hill to stay appeal (entitled 'Request for Continuance to Seek Counsel') [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 07/20/2018 by clerk. 537454 [SMJ] [Entered: 07/20/2018 04:27 PM [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Rejection to Petitioner Daniel C. Hill, the following document(s) cannot be filed: 3 appellant/petitioner 15(c). Reason(s): incomplete form. 15(c) due on 08/03/2018. 537447 [SMJ] [Entered: 07/20/2018 04:17 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Statement Concerning Discrimination pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 15(c) for Petitioner Daniel C. Hill. Service: 07/20/2018 by clerk. 537444 This document has been rejected. See Doc. No. #4 [SMJ] [Entered: 07/20/2018 04:15 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Entry of appearance for Daniel C. Hill as pro se Petitioner [no action taken - incomplete form, not signed (not required)]. Service: 07/20/2018 by clerk. 537439 [SMJ] [Entered: 07/20/2018 04:11 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 07/17/2018. 537436 Fee/IFP due on 08/03/2018. 15(c) due on 08/03/2018. Entry of Appearance due 08/03/2018. Certified List due on 08/29/2018. [SMJ] [Entered: 07/20/2018 04:05 PM] [Transferred from the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.] (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?