Konar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Defendant: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Appellant: Christine Lynn Konar
Appellee: Fidelity National Title Insurance Co. of NY, Trustee Services of Carolina, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Brock and Scott, PLLC, MERS-MERSCORP, US Bank, NA and Troutman and Sanders
Case Number: 7:2019cv00119
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder - Petition in Interpleader Permissive Joinder of Parties filed by Christine Lynn Konar. (Sellers, N.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by US Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Inc. for US Bank, NA. (Rudd, Jamie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Rudd, Jamie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by MERS-MERSCORP identifying Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Maroon Holding, LLC for MERS-MERSCORP. (Rudd, Jamie)
August 6, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #12 Joint MOTION Dismissed from or Terminated as Party to Appeal regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Sellers, N.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Order regarding #12 Joint MOTION Dismissed from or Terminated as Party to Appeal regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Brock and Scott, PLLC, Trustee Services of Carolina. (Presel, Alan)
August 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
August 4, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION Dismissed from or Terminated as Party to Appeal regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Brock and Scott, PLLC, Trustee Services of Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal Order) (Presel, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Sent to Christine Lynn Konar at 637 Ravenswood Road Hapstead, NC 28443 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (McNeill, A)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Appellees' Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of Appellees' Designations - Adversary Proceeding, #2 Part 2 of Appellees' Designations - Adversary Proceeding, #3 Part 3 of Appellees' Designations - Bankruptcy Case, #4 Adversary Proceeding Docket for #18-00056-5-SWH, #5 Bankruptcy Case Docket for #18-02292-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Appellant Designations filed July 29, 2019, #2 Statement of Issues on Appeal by Appellant filed July 8, 2019, #3 Part 1 of Appellant's Designations - Adversary Proceeding, #4 Part 2 of Appellant's Designations - Bankruptcy Case, #5 Adversary Proceeding Docket #18-00056-5-SWH, #6 Bankruptcy Case Docket #18-02292-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Cameron Davis Scott on behalf of Trustee Services of Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service) (Scott, Cameron)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jamie E. Rudd on behalf of MERS-MERSCORP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Troutman and Sanders, US Bank, NA. (Rudd, Jamie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Alan Marc Presel on behalf of Brock and Scott, PLLC. (Presel, Alan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by D. Kyle Deak on behalf of MERS-MERSCORP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Troutman and Sanders, US Bank, NA. (Deak, D.)
June 28, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00056-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider filed June 11, 2019, #2 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse Regarding Effect of Dismissal of Case on Pending Adversary Proceeding filed June 13, 2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christine Lynn Konar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fidelity National Title Insurance Co. of NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Trustee Services of Carolina
Represented By: Cameron Davis Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Represented By: Jamie E. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brock and Scott, PLLC
Represented By: Alan Marc Presel
Represented By: Neil D. Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MERS-MERSCORP
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Represented By: Jamie E. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Bank, NA
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Represented By: Jamie E. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Troutman and Sanders
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Represented By: Jamie E. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?