State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Goldberg et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Laura Kristen Harrell, Joyce Henry Goldberg and William Dean Goldberg
Case Number: 7:2019cv00139
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Laura Kristen Harrell's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #12 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including October 21, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/27/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
September 27, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Laura Kristen Harrell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Green, John)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by John Felix Green, II on behalf of Laura Kristen Harrell. (Green, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Complaint, Summons filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on Laura Kristen Harrell, Administratrix for the Estate of Glenda Sue Henry Bordeaux on 9/09/2019. (Harris, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. William Dean Goldberg waiver sent on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waiver of Service of Summons) (Harris, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Laura Kristen Harrell. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Proposed Summons to Laura Kristen Harrell. (Harris, David)
August 1, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harris, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by David G. Harris, II on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Harris, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as to Kristin Harrell. (Harris, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company as to William Dean Goldberg. (Harris, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joyce Henry Goldberg. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed as to all defendants. (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5040724.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint in Underlying Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Criminal Indictment against Joyce Henry Goldberg, #3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Plea to Voluntary Manslaughter, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Farm Premises-Personal Liability Policy, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Farm Homeowners Policy, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harris, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Goldberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David G. Harris, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kristen Harrell
Represented By: John Felix Green, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Henry Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dean Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?