FS, LLC v. Florence
Plaintiff: FS, LLC
Defendant: Calvin Florence
Case Number: 7:2019cv00145
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #8 Notice of Appearance. In future filings, counsel is reminded to include the case number. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. deRosset, IV on behalf of FS, LLC. (deRosset, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Calvin Florence. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by FS, LLC regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summons. (deRosset, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Notice filed by FS, LLC regarding #1 Complaint Civil Action Cover Sheet. (deRosset, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on August 7, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
August 7, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver or Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #8 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. deRosset, IV on behalf of FS, LLC. (deRosset, Robert) Modified on 8/26/2019 (Collins, S.).
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by FS, LLC (deRosset, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calvin Florence ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5052359.), filed by FS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent, #2 Exhibit Bracket Diagram) (deRosset, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FS, LLC v. Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FS, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. deRosset, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Florence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?