Chavis v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kristin D. Chavis
Defendant: Sammy's Auto Sales, Inc., Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc., Cox Family Automotive, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC, Special Services Incorporated, Team Chevrolet of Swansboro, Inc., Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc., Honda North America, Inc., Honda R&D Americas, Inc., Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc., Honda Motor Co. LTD., Daicel Pyrotechnics LTD, American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Daicel Safety Systems, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc., Daicel Corporation, LeJeune Motor Company, Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc., Honda R&D, Inc. and Honda of Canada Manufacturing
Case Number: 7:2019cv00153
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #12 MOTION to Remand. (Collins, S.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Kristin D. Chavis. (Abrams, Noah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support regarding #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc., Daicel Corporation, Daicel Pyrotechnics LTD, Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC, Daicel Safety Systems, Inc., Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc., Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick J. Cleary, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension, #3 Exhibit C - Order Denying Cox Family Auto's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D - Chavis v. Honda declaration of J. Jongkind signed 09-17-2019) (Cleary, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION to Remand filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc., Daicel Corporation, Daicel Pyrotechnics LTD, Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC, Daicel Safety Systems, Inc., Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc., Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick)
September 18, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Special Services Incorporated (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc. (Keister, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to CORRECT File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc., Daicel Corporation, Daicel Pyrotechnics LTD, Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC, Daicel Safety Systems, Inc., Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc., Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc., Special Services Incorporated regarding #18 Financial Disclosure Statement, #15 Financial Disclosure Statement, #19 Financial Disclosure Statement, #16 Financial Disclosure Statement, #21 Financial Disclosure Statement, #20 Financial Disclosure Statement, #17 Financial Disclosure Statement. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Collins, S.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Special Services Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Special Services Incorporated for Special Services Incorporated. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc. for Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc. for Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc. for Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc. for Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc. for Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc.. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC for Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey D. Keister on behalf of Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc., Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC, Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc., Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc., Special Services Incorporated. (Keister, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Kristin D. Chavis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Streamlining Agreement, #4 Exhibit Order Denying Motion, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #6 Exhibit Proposed Record, #7 Exhibit Owner Notification Letter, #8 Exhibit Bill of Sale) (Abrams, Noah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Kristin D. Chavis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Streamlining Agreement, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Abrams, Noah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Noah Breen Abrams on behalf of Kristin D. Chavis. (Abrams, Noah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Noah Breen Abrams on behalf of Kristin D. Chavis. (Abrams, Noah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cox Family Automotive, Inc. (Sivon, Amie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Amie Carol Sivon on behalf of Cox Family Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Sivon, Amie)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William W. Pollock on behalf of Cox Family Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Pollock, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by LeJeune Motor Company (Cleary, Patrick)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of LeJeune Motor Company. (Cleary, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) if, at the time of removal, a motion is pending for which no supporting memorandum of law has been submitted to the state court, the movant on that motion shall file a supporting memorandum within 14 days of the date of removal, unless the motion is of a type covered by Local Civil Rule 77.2 or unless otherwise ordered by the court. The Local Civil Rule 7.1(f) deadline for a response to the motion runs from the date of the movant's filing of a supporting memorandum in this court. (Collins, S.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant via US Mail Douglas B. Abrams, Margaret S. Abrams, Noah B. Abrams of Abrams & Abrams, PA, 1562 Glenwood Avenue, Raleigh, NC 27608; J. William Owen of Musselwhite, Musselwhite, Branch & Grantham at P. O. Box 1448 Lumberton, NC 28359; Jeffrey D. Keister, Elizabeth H. Overmann of McAngus Goudelock & Courie, PLLC, P. O. Box 30516, Raleigh, NC 27622; William W. Cameron III of Sherrill & Cameron, PLLC at 117 W. Council Street, Salisbury, NC 28144; Danny E. Britt, Jr. Esq. of The Britt Law Firm, PC at 107 North Court Square, Suite 22, Lumberton, NC 28358; William W. Pollock and Edward E. Coleman, III of Ragsdale Liggett PLC at P. O. Box 31507, Raleigh, NC 27622-1507 mailed via US Mail on August 16, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #1 Corrected Notice to Parties) (Rudd, D.).
August 16, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded at case opening that all the parties in the action are to be added for the plaintiff and defendant. (Rudd, D.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co., Ltd. for American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick James Cleary on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Cleary, Patrick)
August 15, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL073571 (Rodriguez, M.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. from Superior Court, Robeson County, case number 19 CVS 0298. ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 NC State Highway Patrol Accident Report, #4 Exhibit 3 American Honda Motor Answer to Plaintiff Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4 Streamlining Agreement re Honda Defendants, #6 Exhibit 5 Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Team Chevrolet with Stevenson Automotive, #7 Exhibit 6 Cox Family Automotive Response to American Honda Motor 1st Request for Admissions, #8 Exhibit 7 LeJeune Motor Co. Response to Plaintiffs 1st Request for Admissions, #9 Exhibit 8 Sammys Auto Sales Response to American Honda Motor 1st Request for Admissions, #10 Exhibit 9 Plaintiffs Response to Daicel Defendants Request for Statement of Monetary Relief Sought, #11 Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs Answer to American Honda Motor 1st Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit 11 Sammys Auto Sales, Inc. Motion to Dismiss and Answer, #13 Exhibit 12 LeJeune Motor Company Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, #14 Exhibit 13 Daicel Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Answer, and Motion to Bifurcate, #15 Exhibit 14 Order Denying Cox Family Automotive, Inc.s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, #16 Exhibit 15 Cox Family Automotive, Inc.s Notice of Appeal, #17 Exhibit 16 Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Objections or Proposed Alternative Record on Appeal, #18 Civil Cover Sheet, #19 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet) (Cleary, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavis v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammy's Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Tube Processing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Family Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: William W. Pollock
Represented By: Amie Carol Sivon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Systems America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Services Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Chevrolet of Swansboro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Technologies America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Americal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Co. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Pyrotechnics LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Systems America Arizona, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeJeune Motor Company
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daicel Safety Systems America Holdins, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda of Canada Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin D. Chavis
Represented By: Noah Breen Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?