Huffin v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dianna P. Huffin
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Case Number: 7:2019cv00154
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Office of the Program Law, Office of the General Counsel on 8/26/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on William Barr, Attorney General of the U.S. on 8/26/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Dianna P. Huffin. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/20/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 19, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dianna P. Huffin (Miller, Jonathan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan P. Miller on behalf of Dianna P. Huffin. (Miller, Jonathan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Dianna P. Huffin. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney Robert J. Higdon, Jr.; Attorney General William P. Barr; Office of the Program Law, Office of the General Counsel, #4 Supplement USM-285 - U.S. Attorney Robert J. Higdon, Jr.; Attorney General William P. Barr; Office of the Program Law, Office of the General Counsel) (Miller, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffin v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna P. Huffin
Represented By: Jonathan P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?