All Occasions and Bridal, Inc. v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: All Occasions and Bridal, Inc.
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00157
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by All Occasions and Bridal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bissette, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Dedman, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Notice filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, of Filing of Acknowledgment of State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of State Court) (Dedman, James)
September 9, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/5/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by All Occasions and Bridal, Inc. (Bissette, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Bissette on behalf of All Occasions and Bridal, Inc.. (Bissette, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Dedman, James)
August 22, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file notice of appearance sent to Matthew S. Bissette at Whitley Law Firm 3301 Benson Drive, Suite 120 Raleigh, North Carolina 27609 via US Mail on 8/22/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Dedman, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Dedman, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Robeson County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-1967. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5073421), filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 State Court Affidavit of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #8 Certificate of Service) (Dedman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Occasions and Bridal, Inc. v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Occasions and Bridal, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?