Buscemi et al v. Brinson Bell
Plaintiff: Gregory Buscemi, William Clark and Kyle Kopitke
Defendant: Executive Director Karen Brinson Bell
Case Number: 7:2019cv00164
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to file supplemental expert report filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report) (Woodruff, Alan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 Consent MOTION excusal of local counsel from appearance at hearing filed by Gregory Buscemi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Woodruff, Alan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 at 02:00 PM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Stouch, L.)
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION Hearing and Oral Argument on Motion for Injunctive Relief and Motion to Dismiss filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Woodruff, Alan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #31 MOTION regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to file Surreply filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #31 MOTION regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to file Surreply filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Cox, Paul)
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to file Surreply filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Surreply opposing Defendant's motion to dismiss) (Woodruff, Alan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Cox, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #29 MOTION to Expedite ruling of Plaintiffs' motion for injunction and Defendant's motion to dismiss. (Stouch, L.)
October 15, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-164-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/15/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
October 9, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #29 MOTION to Expedite ruling of Plaintiffs' motion for injunction and Defendant's motion to dismiss. (Sellers, N.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Expedite ruling of Plaintiffs' motion for injunction and Defendant's motion to dismiss filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Woodruff, Alan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Affidavit of Brian Neesby with Ex. A, #6 Affidavit of Katelyn Love with Exs. A-G) (Cox, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Cox, Paul)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Cox, Paul)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Karen Brinson Bell answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/19/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 19, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cox, Paul)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/13/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 12, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite briefing on motion for injunction. (Sellers, N.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite briefing on motion for injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite briefing on motion for injunction filed by Karen Brinson Bell. (Cox, Paul)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Order regarding #17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite briefing on motion for injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Expedite briefing on motion for injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Order regarding #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Comparison of party qualifying and independent statewide candidate petition signature requirements) (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice filed by Kyle Kopitke . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Sworn Expert Report of Richard Winger, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Expert Report of Richard Winger) (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 Notice filed by Kyle Kopitke . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kyle Kopetik) (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kyle Kopitke. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen Brinson Bell (Cox, Paul)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of Karen Brinson Bell. (Cox, Paul)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Kopitke. Karen Brinson Bell served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Woodruff, Alan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kyle Kopitke (Woodruff, Alan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Clark (Woodruff, Alan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Karen Brinson Bell. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to William Clark, Kyle Kopitke. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 31, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Alan P. Woodruff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Woodruff, Alan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gregory Buscemi (Buscemi, Gregory)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory A. Buscemi on behalf of Gregory Buscemi, William Clark, Kyle Kopitke. (Buscemi, Gregory)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice civil cover sheet filed by Gregory Buscemi, William Clark, Kyle Kopitke regarding #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Buscemi, Gregory) Modified on 9/3/2019 to describe notice. (Rudd, D.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5086123.), filed by Gregory Buscemi, William Clark, Kyle Kopitke. (Buscemi, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buscemi et al v. Brinson Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Buscemi
Represented By: Gregory A. Buscemi
Represented By: Alan P. Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clark
Represented By: Gregory A. Buscemi
Represented By: Alan P. Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Kopitke
Represented By: Gregory A. Buscemi
Represented By: Alan P. Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?