Moore et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Barry A. Moore and Doris T Moore
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00173
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Motions due by 8/28/2020. the matter will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Form) (Sellers, N.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Barry A. Moore, Doris T Moore. (Kroll, William)
October 2, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/10/2019. (Sellers, N.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Malone, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris T Moore (Kroll, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Barry A. Moore (Kroll, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by William Howard Kroll on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kroll, William)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel William H. Kroll of STUBBS & PERDUE, P.A. at 9208 Falls of Neuse Road, Suite 201, Raleigh, NC 27615 mailed via US Mail on September 10, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bankers Standard Insurance Company (Malone, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John I. Malone, Jr on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Malone, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bankers Standard Insurance Company from Pender County, case number 19 CVS 716. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5095815), filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complete Pender County Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement) (Malone, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry A. Moore
Represented By: William Howard Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris T Moore
Represented By: William Howard Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: John I. Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?