Hussain v. Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellee: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee
Appellant: Laketta Malourica Hussain
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 7:2019cv00201
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court DISMISSES the appeal WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/12/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Laketta Malourica Hussain at 500 Highland Glens Drive, Shallotte, NC 28470. (Stouch, L.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Dismissing Case without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/12/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Laketta Malourica Hussain at 500 Highland Glens Drive, Shallotte, NC 28470. (Stouch, L.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Present Evidence and Emergency Motion of Stay and Injunction to Stay Home filed by Laketta Malourica Hussain. (Stouch, L.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Recommendation for Dismissal of Appeal. Signed by Stephani W. Humrickhouse, United States Bankruptcy Judge on October 28, 2019. (Stouch, L.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 ***Disregard: Incorrect document attached. See DE #5 Recommendation.*** Recommendation for Dismissal of Appeal. Signed by Stephani W. Humrickhouse, United States Bankruptcy Judge on October 28, 2019. (Stouch, L.) Modified on 10/30/2019 (Stouch, L.).
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Present Evidence and Emergency Motion of Stay and Injunction to Stay Home filed by Laketta Malourica Hussain. (Stouch, L.)
October 11, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-04238-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal - Judge Humrickhouse's Order of 9/19/2019) (McNeill, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussain v. Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laketta Malourica Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?