Bryant v. Core Contents Restoration, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cathleen Bryant
Defendant: Adriane B. Null, Yvonne D. McCormick, Nicole S. McCormick, Karen J. Koss and Core Contents Restoration, LLC
Case Number: 7:2020cv00040
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #36 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Edwards, S.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support regarding #36 Motion For Leave to File An Amended Memorandum in Support of Their #32 Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Hicks, Warren)
April 29, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION For Leave to File An Amended Memorandum in Support of Their #32 Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support, #2 Supplement REDLINED Proposed Amended Memorandum in Support, #3 Supplement Proposed Supplemental Exhibit C to Memorandum, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Warren)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/16/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 16, 2020 Filing 34 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e). Response due by 5/8/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #32 Memorandum in Support. Counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Case administrator corrected the docket text to include document descriptions for each exhibit. Counsel is reminded to comply with this rule on future filings to avoid having to refile your documents. No further action is required at this time. (Edwards, S.)
April 14, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Hicks, Warren)
April 14, 2020 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support regarding #31 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e) filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Work Authorization Agreement & Direction to Pay, #2 Exhibit 2 - Copy of Mitchell v. Walters 2010 U.S. Dist.LEXIS 93265 Opinion) (Hicks, Warren)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3), (7), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1),(2), MOTION for More Definite Statement Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(e) filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Warren)
April 14, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard E. Myers II in Wilmington: Scheduling Conference held on 4/14/2020. Counsel for the defendants were present telephonically. Plaintiff failed to appear telephonically as previously instructed. The court attempted to reach the plaintiff via telephone and was unable to do so. The hearing concluded and may be reset at a later date. (Court Reporter Risa Kramer) (Edwards, S.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 Corrected Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicole S. McCormick (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 28 Corrected Financial Disclosure Statement by Adriane B. Null (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 27 Corrected Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen J. Koss (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 26 Corrected Financial Disclosure Statement by Yvonne D. McCormick (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 25 Corrected Financial Disclosure Statement by Core Contents Restoration, LLC (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicole S. McCormick (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Adriane B. Null (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen J. Koss (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Yvonne D. McCormick (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Core Contents Restoration, LLC (Hicks, Warren)
April 1, 2020 **** Set Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Wilmington Courtroom #160 Telephonically before District Judge Richard E. Myers II. (Edwards, S.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to defendants Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, and Adriane B. Null - answer due by 4/14/2020; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary, Preliminary, and Permanent Injunction up to and including 4/14/2020. It is further ORDERED that the temporary restraining order entered on 3/3/2020 [DE-8], and extended for good cause shown on 3/18/2020 [DE-14], is further EXTENDED until 4/14/2020. Plaintiff will not be required to post any further security bond. It is further ORDERED that a telephonic scheduling conference is set for April 14, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Conference call instructions will be emailed to counsel for Defendants and sent by mail to Plaintiff following the entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 4/1/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
April 1, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: #18 Motion to Amend. Counsel incorrectly selected a motion event to file in the Amended Certificate of Service at #18 . The deputy clerk corrected the docket text and terminated the entry as a motion. No further action by counsel required. (Edwards, S.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE regarding #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Hicks, Warren)
March 31, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead and First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions for Injunction. (Edwards, S.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Warren Kuhn Hicks on behalf of All Defendants. (Hicks, Warren)
March 31, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement regarding #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Edwards, S.)
March 31, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Edwards, S.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead, First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motions for Injunction filed by Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hicks, Warren)
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 Document: Copy of Receipt for payment of $450.00 pursuant to the #14 order, filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Edwards, S.)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order. The Temporary Restraining Order entered on 3/3/2020 [DE-8], is EXTENDED until 3/31/2020. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Cathleen Bryant is DIRECTED to pay to the clerk an additional $450.00 dollars as security within five (5) business days of the date of the entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers, II on 3/18/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service for Complaint, Motion for TRO, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Summons filed by Cathleen Bryant served on Adrian B. Null on 3/11/2020. (Edwards, S.)
March 17, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order. (Edwards, S.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathleen Bryant. Core Contents Restoration, LLC served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Edwards, S.)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Edwards, S.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 Document: Copy of Receipt for payment of $450.00 pursuant to the #8 order, filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 03/03/2020. Previous Case Number was 4:20-cv-40-M. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 Notices of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons filed by Cathleen Bryant regarding #1 Complaint. Served on Defendants K. Koss, A. Null, N. McCormick and Y. McCormick. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; holding in abeyance #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and #4 Motion for Permanent Injunction. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff Cathleen Bryant is DIRECTED to pay to the clerk four hundred fifty (450) dollars as security, pursuant to Rule 65(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within three (3) business days of the date of the entry of this order. It is further ORDERED that this temporary restraining order shall remain in full force and effect for fourteen (14) days from the date of the entry of this order or until the Court orders otherwise, whichever is earlier. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 3/3/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Redesignating Division. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:20-CV-40-M. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-40-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/3/2020. Copy sent to Cathleen Bryant, 2117 Lenox Street, Jacksonville, NC 28546 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction. (Edwards, S.)
March 3, 2020 Remark - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Core Contents Restoration, LLC, Karen J. Koss, Nicole S. McCormick, Yvonne D. McCormick, Adriane B. Null. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support regarding #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Rudd, D.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number NEW001074), filed by Cathleen Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit A- Photograph of Dining Room, #3 Exhibit B- Vault Inventory List, #4 Exhibit C- Box Inventory List, #5 Exhibit D- Picture of Silver Forks, #6 Exhibit E- January 2019 estimate, #7 Exhibit F- Invoice dated January 2019, #8 Exhibit G- Photographs that accompained January 2019 estimate, #9 Exhibit H- April 2019 estimate from Yvonne, #10 Exhibit I- April 2019 estimate from Nicole, #11 Exhibit J- Invoice dated April 2019 Florida, #12 Exhibit K- Invoice dated April 2019 North Carolina, #13 Exhibit L- Invoice dated December 2019, #14 Exhibit M- No arehouse receipt from Core, #15 Exhibit N- No bill of landing from Core, #16 Exhibit O- Missing items pulled for sale, #17 Exhibit P- Written damage list provided, #18 Exhibit Q- Threat to sell, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Core Contents Restoration, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriane B. Null
Represented By: Warren Kuhn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne D. McCormick
Represented By: Warren Kuhn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole S. McCormick
Represented By: Warren Kuhn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen J. Koss
Represented By: Warren Kuhn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Contents Restoration, LLC
Represented By: Warren Kuhn Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?