Young v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bernice Young
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv00076
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Marie D. Lang on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lang, Marie)
June 8, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 6/22/2020. (Stouch, L.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Motions due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/29/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
May 20, 2020 Remark - #10 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.)
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/13/2020. (Stouch, L.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bernice Young (Bissette, Matthew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Bissette on behalf of Bernice Young. (Bissette, Matthew)
April 28, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet). (Walther, Brianna)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Brianna Hawkins Walther on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Matthew S. Bissette of WHITLEY LAW FIRM at 3301 Benson Drive, Suite 120, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on April 24, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Plt's Amended Complaint) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Walther, Brianna)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 20-CvS-292. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5400395), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #5 Exhibit D - Plt's Voter Registration, #6 Exhibit E - DOI Company Search) (Walther, Brianna) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 4/24/2020) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Brianna Hawkins Walther
Represented By: Marie D. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice Young
Represented By: Matthew S. Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?