Teeter v. Loomis Armored US
Plaintiff: Hayden Teeter
Defendant: Loomis Armored US
Case Number: 7:2020cv00079
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Hayden Teeter. Loomis Armored US waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Angel, Kirk)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hayden Teeter (Angel, Kirk)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk J. Angel on behalf of Hayden Teeter. (Angel, Kirk)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: Notice to Counsel - Counsel filed a Request for Waiver of Service. See DE #2 . (Rudd, D.)
April 30, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
April 30, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Hayden Teeter. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to CT Corporation System, 160 Mine Lake Court, Suite 200, Raleigh NC 27615-6417 on 4/30/2020 by Hayden Teeter. Waiver of Service due by 5/30/2020. (Angel, Kirk)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loomis Armored US ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5408667.), filed by Hayden Teeter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #3 Exhibit B - NRTS) (Angel, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teeter v. Loomis Armored US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Armored US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayden Teeter
Represented By: Kirk J. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?