Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Nobles
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Connie Nobles
Case Number: 7:2020cv00087
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Connie Nobles waiver sent on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email correspondance re Waiver of Service) (Simpson, George)
May 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Simpson, George)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by George L. Simpson, IV on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Simpson, George)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 04175435198.), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint - Civil Superior Court, #4 Exhibit C - Sept 3, 2019 letter) (Simpson, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: George L. Simpson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nobles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?