The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv00103
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Appointing Mediator. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2020. (Copy of Order sent to H. Mark Hamlet, Esq. at Hamlet & Associates PLLC, 5215 Junction Park Circle, Suite 202, Wilmington, NC 28412 via U.S. Mail.)(Waddell, K.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 Selection of H. Mark Hamlet as mediator filed by The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC. (Parrish, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 5/31/2021. Motions due by 6/30/2021. The trial of this matter will be set by separate order from District Judge Richard E. Myers II. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 7/24/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Joint Rule 26(f) Report #13 referred to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for an order on scheduling. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC. (Parrish, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/14/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 14, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #11 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Farm Certified Policy) (Lewis, J.)
June 22, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including July 14, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/22/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC (Parrish, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Parrish on behalf of The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC. (Parrish, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeremy M. Wilson on behalf of The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC. (Wilson, Jeremy)
June 18, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Waddell, K.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting extension to answer) (Lewis, J.)
June 17, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 17, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #1 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Michael J. Parrish and Jeremy M. Wilson of Ward and Smith, P.A. at P.O. Box 7068, Wilmington, NC 28406-7068 mailed via US Mail on June 17, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from New Hanover County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 1539. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5475002), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - New Hanover County court file, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Lewis, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Diane K. Pappayliou
Represented By: Shelley Walters Coleman
Represented By: J. Scott Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Reserve at Mayfaire, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Parrish
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?