McNeil v. Glasco et al
Plaintiff: Jasma McNeil
Defendant: K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC, Glasco Trucking, LLC and James Glasco
Case Number: 7:2020cv00133
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Jasma McNeil Reply to Answer (Bryant, Ralph)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC identifying Corporate Parent K.L. Breeden & Sons, LLC, Corporate Parent K.L. Breeden & Sons, LLC for K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC. (Robinson, William)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File. The plaintiff shall file a reply pleading within three days of entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 31, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Pleading Alleging Last Clear Chance. (Stouch, L.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Pleading Alleging Last Clear Chance filed by Jasma McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bryant, Ralph)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/17/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by James Glasco, Glasco Trucking, LLC, K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC. (Gooding, Dorothy)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by James Glasco, Glasco Trucking, LLC, K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC. (Robinson, William)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC. K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Robinson, William)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by James Glasco. James Glasco waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Robinson, William)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Glasco Trucking, LLC. Glasco Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 7/16/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Robinson, William)
July 29, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James Glasco, Glasco Trucking, LLC, K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jasma McNeil (Bryant, Ralph)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ralph T. Bryant, Jr on behalf of Jasma McNeil. (Bryant, Ralph)
July 16, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 16, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Jasma McNeil. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5518665.), filed by Jasma McNeil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons James Glasco, #3 Proposed Summons Glasco Trucking, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC) (Bryant, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeil v. Glasco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. L. Breeden & Sons, LLC
Represented By: William C. Robinson
Represented By: Dorothy M. Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glasco Trucking, LLC
Represented By: William C. Robinson
Represented By: Dorothy M. Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Glasco
Represented By: William C. Robinson
Represented By: Dorothy M. Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasma McNeil
Represented By: Ralph T. Bryant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?