Koumalatsos v. Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Koumalatsos
Defendant: Town Manager Heather Reynolds, Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina, Mayor Jeff Wenzel, Captain Ewan Richards and Lori Faircloth
Case Number: 7:2020cv00136
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon C. Pettijohn on behalf of Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Pettijohn, Brandon)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Heather Reynolds, Jeff Wenzel, Ewan Richards, Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina, Lori Faircloth. Nicholas Koumalatsos waiver sent on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Wenzel (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ewan Richards (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Heather Reynolds (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lori Faircloth (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Jeff Wenzel. (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Ewan Richards. (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Heather Reynolds. (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Lori Faircloth. (Collier, Clay)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina. (Collier, Clay)
July 27, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #4 Notice of Appearance on behalf of attorneys David Ervin and Brandon Pettijohn. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. David Ervin and Brandon Pettijohn must refile their own notices of appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, service of any court generated document (i.e., orders, notices, etc.) will only be made on the attorney(s) registered in CM/ECF. It is the responsibility of the law firm's electronic users to notify and serve all other firm members appearing in the case who are not receiving electronic notification. (Collins, S.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lori Faircloth, Heather Reynolds, Ewan Richards, Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina, Jeff Wenzel. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Nicholas Koumalatsos regarding #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Proposed Summons Lori Faircloth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Heather Reynolds, #2 Proposed Summons Ewan Richards, #3 Proposed Summons Holly Ridge, #4 Proposed Summons Jeff Wenzel) (Lindquist, Aaron)
July 20, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #4 Notice of Appearance on behalf of attorneys David Ervin and Brandon Pettijohn. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron Daniel Lindquist on behalf of Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Notice of Appearance) (Lindquist, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Koumalatsos (Lindquist, Aaron)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5522466.), filed by Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Lindquist, Aaron) Modified on 7/20/2020 (Collins, S.).
July 17, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Nicholas Koumalatsos. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 17, 2020 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #2 ** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5522466.), filed by Nicholas Koumalatsos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lindquist, Aaron) Modified on 7/20/2020 (Collins, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koumalatsos v. Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Manager Heather Reynolds
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Holly Ridge, North Carolina
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Jeff Wenzel
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Ewan Richards
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Faircloth
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Koumalatsos
Represented By: Brandon C. Pettijohn
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?