Bullard v. Saul
Plaintiff: Teresa Lyn Bullard
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 7:2020cv00159
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew M. Saul on 10/6/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 9/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 10/1/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 17, 2020 Remark - Certified copy of #9 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Stouch, L.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Service filed by Teresa Lyn Bullard . (Davis, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Stouch, L.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/2/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 3, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel failed to file USM 285 forms for service by the US Marshals on defendant. Counsel is directed to prepare and file the USM 285 forms for each party to be served in this case. They should be filed using the event 'Notice - Other.' (Stouch, L.)
September 1, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Redesignating Division to Southern Division - This case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 7:20-CV-159-BO. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-163-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Teresa Lyn Bullard (Davis, William)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by William L. Davis, III on behalf of Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Davis, William)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, William) Modified on 9/1/2020 (Stouch, L.).
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel is directed to refile this action. When filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, the motion is filed as the initiating document and then attaching the complaint, any supporting documents, civil cover sheet and proposed summons. (Rudd, D.)
August 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
August 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel - For clarification, when refiling your Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, use this same case number. Do not refile a whole new civil case. Thank you. (Rudd, D.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by William L. Davis, III on behalf of Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Davis, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Teresa Lyn Bullard identifying Corporate Parent William L. Davis for Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Davis, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Disclosure filed by Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Davis, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teresa Lyn Bullard, filed by Teresa Lyn Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Lyn Bullard
Represented By: William L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?