United States of America - Internal Revenue Service v. Alicea et al
Appellee: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee, Sarah J Zabek and Fabio Alicea
Interested Party: Stephanie J. Butler
Appellant: United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 7:2020cv00169
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 Appellant's BRIEF by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. Appellee Brief due by 11/27/2020. (Bishop, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #7 Bankruptcy Record. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Collins, S.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (McNeill, A)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (McNeill, A)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 5, 2020, before Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court.. (McNeill, A)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file.. (Attachments: #1 Appellant's Designations, #2 Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service Proof of Claim 9-1 filed January 29, 2020, #3 Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service Proof of Claim 9-2 filed April 29, 2020, #4 Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service Proof of Claim 9-3 filed June 4, 2020, #5 Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service Proof of Claim 9-4 filed June 19, 2020, #6 Docket Sheet in Bankruptcy Case Number 15-05841-5-SWH) (McNeill, A)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Kyle)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sarah J Zabek (Sasser, Travis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fabio Alicea (Sasser, Travis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Philip Sasser on behalf of Fabio Alicea, Sarah J Zabek. (Sasser, Travis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
September 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-05841-5-SWH. File received. (Attachments: #1 Order Under Appeal - Order of Judge Humrickhouse filed August 24, 2020) (Howard, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America - Internal Revenue Service v. Alicea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III, Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By: Joseph A. Bledsoe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sarah J Zabek
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fabio Alicea
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Stephanie J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?