Facello v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sandra Facello
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv00234
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Hanna, Douglas)
January 20, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #10 Answer to Complaint. Counsel is directed to refile because the attachments/exhibits (pages 11-49) should be filed asseparate pdfs attached to the main document. See Section V.E.1(d) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Collins, S.)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Hanna, Douglas)
December 23, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including January 19, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/23/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
December 23, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Tripp, S.)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hanna, Douglas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas W. Hanna on behalf of United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Hanna, Douglas)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Vance Edward Jennings on behalf of Sandra Facello. (Jennings, Vance)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Sandra Facello Proposed Summons. (Jennings, Vance) Modified on 12/2/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 Notice filed by Sandra Facello Proposed Summons. (Jennings, Vance) Modified on 12/2/2020 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 1, 2020 Notice to Counsel. Counsel is reminded that all filings subsequent the initial filing should contain the case number. (Collins, S.)
December 1, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
December 1, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Proposed Summons. The proposed summons have not been completely filled out with counsel's address. Counsel shall refile using the event Notice-Other. (Collins, S.)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sandra Facello (Jennings, Vance)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #6 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Vance Edward Jennings on behalf of Sandra Facello. (Jennings, Vance) Modified on 12/2/2020 (Collins, S.).
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5749541.), filed by Sandra Facello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Jennings, Vance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facello v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Facello
Represented By: Vance Edward Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas W. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?