George v. Saul
Plaintiff: Synavia George
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 7:2020cv00251
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security on 1/7/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security on 1/7/2021. (Sellers, N.)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Synavia George (McChesney, Paul)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by Synavia George USM Form 285 to Robert Higdon. (McChesney, Paul)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Synavia George USM Form 285 to William Barr. (McChesney, Paul)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 Notice filed by Synavia George USM Form 285 to Andrew M. Saul. (McChesney, Paul)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Synavia George. (Sellers, N.)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/21/2020. (Sellers, N.)
December 21, 2020 Remark: Certified copy of #2 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
December 21, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not include USM-285 Forms when filing. Please file these using the 'Notice-other' event so that summonses can be forwarded to the US Marshal for service. (Sellers, N.)
December 18, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
December 18, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-6] Disclosure form. The Financial Disclosure Statement is a stand alone document. Counsel should refile the document using the event under "Other Documents-Financial Disclosure Statement." (Rudd, D.)
December 18, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Synavia George. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Robert Higdon, #4 Proposed Summons to Andrew Saul, #5 Proposed Summons to William Barr, #6 Disclosure form, #7 Index) (McChesney, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synavia George
Represented By: Paul T. McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?