McDow v. Holmes
Plaintiff: Lamarr Andre McDow
Defendant: Fontella Marie Holmes
Case Number: 7:2021cv00017
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support regarding #19 MOTION to Strike #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Hogewood, A.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Hogewood, A.)
March 29, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #16 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court By Submitting Electronic Recording, #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, McDow v. Holmes, Case No. 18-CVS-1963 (Brunswick Cty. Super. Ct.) - Filed June 17, 2019, #3 Exhibit B - Motion to Dismiss Complaint, McDow v. Holmes, Case No. 18- CVS-1963 (Brunswick Cty. Super. Ct.) - Filed June 21, 2019, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint for Injunctive Relief, N.C. Private Protective Servs. Bd. v. Hagler, Case No. 13-CVS-4090 (Wake Cty. Super. Ct.) - Filed March 25, 2013, #5 Exhibit D - Second Declaration of Fontella Marie Holmes, #6 Exhibit E - City National Bank Website Printout) (Hogewood, A.)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Hogewood, A.)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court By Submitting Electronic Recording filed by Lamarr Andre McDow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Accept CD Filing) (Braswell, Ira)
March 9, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #15 Motion to Amend/Correct, #14 Motion to Remand. Pursuant to Section V(E)(e) of the CM/ECF Policy Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description of the document. Labeling an attachment as Exhibit 1 or Exhibit A is insufficient. Further, when filing a document with more than five (5) attachments, the first attached document must be an index of all subsequently attached documents. No need to re-file any documents at this time, however counsel shall follow this rule for all future filings. (Sellers, N.)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Lamarr Andre McDow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Braswell, Ira)
March 7, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lamarr Andre McDow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Braswell, Ira)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Ira Braswell, IV on behalf of Lamarr Andre McDow. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Braswell, Ira)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint (With Jury Demand), McDow v. Holmes, Case No. 18- CVS-1963 (Brunswick Co. Super. Ct.) - Filed October 19, 2018, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal, McDow v. Holmes, Case No. 18-CVS-1963 (Brunswick Co. Super. Ct.) - Filed June 25, 2019, #4 Exhibit C - N.C. Department of Public Safety Information - Lamarr A. McDow, #5 Exhibit D - Online News Article - Oak Island Man Facing Charges for Acting as a P.I., STARNEWSONLINE (July 29, 2013), #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Fontella Marie Holmes, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Karen Lee McNeill) (Hogewood, A.)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Hogewood, A.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Service filed by Fontella Marie Holmes regarding Case Selected for Mediation, . (Houston, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 Notice filed by Fontella Marie Holmes (Notice of Filing of As-Filed Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal - L.R. 5.3(a)(2)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - As-Filed Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (February 5, 2021)) (Hogewood, A.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Zachary Scott Buckheit on behalf of Fontella Marie Holmes. (Buckheit, Zachary)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Thomas Houston on behalf of Fontella Marie Holmes. (Houston, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fontella Marie Holmes (Hogewood, A.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by A. Lee Hogewood, III on behalf of Fontella Marie Holmes. (Hogewood, A.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR - Notice filed by Fontella Marie Holmes regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Filing of As-Filed Notice of Removal Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(2). (Buckheit, Zachary) Modified on 2/9/2021 to note filed in error per attorney-(Foell, S.).
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Ira Braswell IV of Braswell Law, PLLC at P. O. Box 703, Louisburg, NC 27549 mailed via US Mail on February 8, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
February 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Fontella Marie Holmes. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
February 8, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Amended Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Hogewood, A.)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fontella Marie Holmes from Brunswick County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-1571. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5862593), filed by Fontella Marie Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Civil Action Cover Sheet (State Court), #3 Exhibit A-2 - Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Plaintiff's Complaint with Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit A-4 - Alleged Return of Service of Summons, #6 Exhibit A-5 - Notice of Lis Pendens, #7 Exhibit A-6 - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (To Be Filed), #9 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit D - Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Hogewood, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDow v. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamarr Andre McDow
Represented By: Ira Braswell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fontella Marie Holmes
Represented By: A. Lee Hogewood, III
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Houston
Represented By: Zachary Scott Buckheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?