United States of America v. $107,573.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $107,573.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 7:2021cv00022
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Warrant of Arrest - Defendant served on 3/2/2021. (Waddell, K.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem issued by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court, on 2/10/2021. (Waddell, K.)
February 10, 2021 Document Referred: #2 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court. (Waddell, K.)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Lee Fesak on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fesak, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Notice Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fesak, Matthew)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $107,573.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Task Force Officer Michael C. Ellis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fesak, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $107,573.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $107,573.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?