Winyah Rivers Alliance v. Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Winyah Rivers Alliance
Defendant: Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC and Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00043
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC, Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit July 18, 2019 Email, #2 Exhibit Almac American Permit Renewal application, #3 Exhibit DMRs August 2020 thru February 2021) (Shipman, Gary)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC, Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (Shipman, Gary)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Complaint filed by Winyah Rivers Alliance served on Defendants, by Registered Agent on March 11, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Service to Registered Agent, #2 Exhibit B - Postmarked Receipts for Outgoing Mail, #3 Exhibit C - Domestic Return Receipts, #4 Exhibit D - USPS Tracking Page) (Hillaker, Heather)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up and including May 1, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/18/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC, Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shipman, Gary)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ACTIVE ENERGY GROUP, PLC for Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (Shipman, Gary)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ACTIVE ENERGY GROUP, PLC for Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC. (Shipman, Gary)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Gary K. Shipman on behalf of Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC, Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (Shipman, Gary)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Winyah Rivers Alliance (Hillaker, Heather)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Heather Hillaker on behalf of Winyah Rivers Alliance. (Hillaker, Heather)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC, Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Rita Rasheed on behalf of Winyah Rivers Alliance. (Rasheed, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5920117.), filed by Winyah Rivers Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 2020 Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Receipt of Notice of Intent to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - April 2019 Modified NPDES Permit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment, #5 Corporate Disclosure Form for Winyah Rivers Alliance, #6 Summons to Active Energy Renewable Power, #7 Summons to Lumberton Energy Holdings, #8 Notice of Appearance - Heather Hillaker) (Hillaker, Heather)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-8] Notice of Appearance - Heather Hillaker. The notice of appearance is a stand alone document. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Notices - Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-5] The Corporate Disclosure Statement. The corporate disclsoure is a stand alone document. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement". (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winyah Rivers Alliance v. Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Energy Renewable Power, LLC
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumberton Energy Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winyah Rivers Alliance
Represented By: Heather Hillaker
Represented By: Elizabeth Rita Rasheed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?