Walbridge Aldinger LLC v. Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Walbridge Aldinger LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00057
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc., filed by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Coghill, Ashley)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Defendant seeks leave to file a third-party complaint against Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. For good cause shown, pursuant to Rule 14, the motion DE #16 is granted. Defendant is DIRECTED to file its third-party complaint within five days of the date of this order. Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 5/23/22. Mediation Deadline set for 12/8/21. Motions due by 7/22/22. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/27/21. (Collins, S.)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #16 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. (Collins, S.)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 6/17/2021. (Collins, S.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Coghill, Ashley)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint filed by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Coghill, Ashley)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Walbridge Aldinger LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walbridge Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Walbridge Construction Holdings LLC for Walbridge Aldinger LLC. (Coddington, Phoebe)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashley M. Coghill on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Coghill, Ashley)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/24/21. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/19/2021. (Collins, S.)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Notice of Appearance. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel is directed to update contact information in CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S.)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Huston, Levi)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by John W. Ong on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Ong, John)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #5 Notice of Appearance on behalf of John W. Ong, #7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Ashley Coghill. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 **Duplicate Filing to #9 ** Notice of Appearance filed by Phoebe Norton Coddington on behalf of Walbridge Aldinger LLC. (Coddington, Phoebe) Modified on 4/8/2021 (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Phoebe Norton Coddington on behalf of Walbridge Aldinger LLC. (Coddington, Phoebe)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Sara R. Lincoln on behalf of Walbridge Aldinger LLC. (Lincoln, Sara)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Appearance on behalf of Ashley Coghill filed by Levi A. Huston on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Huston, Levi) Modified on 4/8/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Levi A. Huston on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Huston, Levi)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #11 ** Notice of Appearance on behalf of John W. Ong filed by Levi A. Huston on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Huston, Levi) Modified on 4/8/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). Modified on 4/13/2021 (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Sara R. Lincoln and Phoebe N. Coddington of Lincoln Derr PLLC at 4350 Congress Street, Suite 575, Charlotte, NC 28209 mailed via US Mail on April 6, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - The address information in the signature block for John W. Ong on the notice of removal not match the information that the court has in its CM/ECF database. Counsel should email the updated law firm information to the clerk's office at NCED-AttomeyUpdate@nced.uscourts.gov. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Rudd, D.)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Notice of Appearance - All counsel should file their own notice of appearance so that their name will be added to the docket sheet and they will receive notices of electronic filing (NEF's). (Rudd, D.)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Levi A. Huston on behalf of Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Huston, Levi)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc. (Huston, Levi)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc. from Brunswick County State Court, case number 21 CVS 329. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5968483), filed by Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Huston, Levi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walbridge Aldinger LLC v. Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Cape Fear Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Levi A. Huston
Represented By: John W. Ong
Represented By: Ashley M. Coghill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walbridge Aldinger LLC
Represented By: Phoebe Norton Coddington
Represented By: Sara R. Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?