Oles v. The United States of America
Plaintiff: Ms. Debra J Oles and Debra Jean Oles
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 7:2021cv00100
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Collins, S.)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Notice Proposed Summons filed by Debra Jean Oles regarding #1 Complaint. (Garland, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
June 15, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint DE1-2 Proposed Summons. Counsel is to refile the proposed summons using the correct caption and the address information. Counsel can use the event "Notice-Other" to file the corrected proposed summons. (Collins, S.)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Debra J Oles (Garland, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael E. Garland on behalf of Debra J Oles. (Garland, Michael)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6068173.), filed by Debra J Oles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Garland, Michael) (Attachments 1 and 2 flattened and replaced on 6/2/2021) (Edwards, S.).
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is to refile the proposed summons using the correct caption and the address information. Counsel can use the event "Notice-Other" to file the corrected proposed summons. (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Debra J Oles. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet and the proposed summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oles v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Debra J Oles
Represented By: Michael E. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Jean Oles
Represented By: Michael E. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?