Kordun Express, Inc. et al v. Almasi
Plaintiff: Kordun Express, Inc. and Floyd, Inc.
Defendant: Laszlo Almasi
Case Number: 7:2021cv00123
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Floyd, Inc., Kordun Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wilson, Jeremy)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 Notice directing plaintiff to proceed after failure to answer in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within twenty-one (21) days of receipt of this notice. (Sellers, N.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notices & Disclosures (First Amended) filed by Floyd, Inc., Kordun Express, Inc. served on Laszlo Almasi on July 9, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Signature of Defendant) (Wilson, Jeremy)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Matthew A. Wood on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wood, Matthew)
July 23, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notices & Disclosures filed by Floyd, Inc., Kordun Express, Inc. served on Laszlo Almasi on July 9, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service) (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Jordan McCoy Spanner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Spanner, Jordan)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Laszlo Almasi. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Floyd, Inc. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kordun Express, Inc. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #3 Notice of Special Appearance - Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(e)(1), the Special Appearance Attorney must complete the "electronic filing attorney registration form" and comply with Section IV.D of the Policy Manual. Once Counsel receives their login and password, they must file their notice of special appearance so that they will be added to the docket and be able to receive notices of electronic filing "NEF's". (Rudd, D.)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Floyd, Inc., Kordun Express, Inc. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 6, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding: Notice of Deficiency Failure to File Financial Disclosure - DISREGARD NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Financial Disclosure Statements were filed at #4 and #5 . (Rudd, D.)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jeremy M. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeremy M. Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Jeremy)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6122481.), filed by Kordun Express, Inc., Floyd, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Laszlo Almasi) (Wilson, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kordun Express, Inc. et al v. Almasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kordun Express, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Represented By: Jordan McCoy Spanner
Represented By: Matthew A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy M. Wilson
Represented By: Jordan McCoy Spanner
Represented By: Matthew A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laszlo Almasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?