Costabile v. Fogleman et al
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Costabile
Defendant: Keith Fogleman and Ustopit, LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv00155
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 6, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #12 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including November 12, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
October 5, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Keith Fogleman, Ustopit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Meier, Douglas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Keith Fogleman, Ustopit, LLC (Meier, Douglas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas W Meier on behalf of All Defendants. (Meier, Douglas)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Remington A Lenton-Young on behalf of Michael Joseph Costabile. (Lenton-Young, Remington)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Alfredo A Bismonte on behalf of Michael Joseph Costabile. (Bismonte, Alfredo)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Ronald C Finley on behalf of Michael Joseph Costabile. (Finley, Ronald)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by James L. Lester on behalf of Michael Joseph Costabile. (Lester, James)
September 15, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Keith Fogleman, Ustopit, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Southern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 7:21-CV-155-BO. No further filing shall be made in 4:21-CV-135-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/15/2021. (Sellers, N.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 via US Mail on September 15, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
September 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Southern division. The Clerk of Court will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
September 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-2] Proposed Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the proposed summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
September 15, 2021 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 09/15/2021. Old Case Number 4:21-cv-135. (Sellers, N.)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael Joseph Costabile (Lester, James)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6228122.), filed by Michael Joseph Costabile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Fogleman, #3 Proposed Summons Ustopit, #4 Exhibit 1- Patent 7,920,052, #5 Exhibit 2- Patent 10,504,300) (Lester, James) Modified on 9/15/2021 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costabile v. Fogleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Costabile
Represented By: James L. Lester
Represented By: Ronald C Finley
Represented By: Alfredo A Bismonte
Represented By: Remington A Lenton-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Fogleman
Represented By: Douglas W Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ustopit, LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?