Stephenson v. City of Lumberton et al
Plaintiff: Erik Stephenson
Defendant: City of Lumberton and Housing Authority of the City of Lumberton
Case Number: 7:2021cv00162
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Lumberton. (Hill, William)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by William L. Hill on behalf of City of Lumberton. (Hill, William)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by John P. Wright on behalf of Housing Authority of the City of Lumberton. (Wright, John)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Housing Authority of the City of Lumberton. (Wright, John)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Erik Stephenson. (Bowers, Walter)
October 14, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
September 28, 2021 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants by Erik Stephenson. Waiver of Service due by 11/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit) (Bowers, Walter)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Erik Stephenson (Bowers, Walter)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6250297.), filed by Erik Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowers, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. City of Lumberton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Stephenson
Represented By: Walter L. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lumberton
Represented By: William L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Lumberton
Represented By: John P. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?