Bostic v. Smithfield Foods Inc.
Plaintiff: Terry Bostic
Defendant: Smithfield Foods Inc. and Smithfield Foods Inc. d/b/a Smithfield Packing
Case Number: 7:2021cv00186
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smithfield Foods Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Charge of Discrimination) (Romanzo, Melissa)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Smithfield Foods Inc.. (Romanzo, Melissa)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Smithfield Foods Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WH Group Limited, Corporate Parent United Global Foods (US) Holdings, Inc. for Smithfield Foods Inc.. (Romanzo, Melissa)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa A. Romanzo on behalf of Smithfield Foods Inc.. (Romanzo, Melissa)
December 18, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Terry Bostic. Smithfield Foods Inc. waiver sent on 10/28/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Bowers, Walter)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Terry Bostic. (Bowers, Walter)
November 1, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
November 1, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #4 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel failed to sign and flatten the financial disclosure statement. Counsel is directed to refile the document using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement". (Rudd, D.)
November 1, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver of Service, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet, request for waiver of service, notice of a lawsuit and request to waive service of a summons) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Walter L. Bowers on behalf of Terry Bostic. (Bowers, Walter)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Terry Bostic (Bowers, Walter)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Notice filed by Terry Bostic regarding #1 Complaint . (Bowers, Walter)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by Terry Bostic. (Bowers, Walter)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smithfield Foods Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6296630.), filed by Terry Bostic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowers, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostic v. Smithfield Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bostic
Represented By: Walter L. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods Inc. d/b/a Smithfield Packing
Represented By: Melissa A. Romanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?