Farrior et al v. Ballard et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Farrior, Madison Bowen, Murguia Arya, Patirce Bejamin, Kendall Farrior, Stephanie Pages, Nicole Emery, Venkita Waddell, Jessica Smith, Krishanta Jones, Briahna Comartie, Sharon Bellamy, Denisha Simmons, Kelly Lantz, Heather Hinson, Angel Grant and Patrice Benjamin
Defendant: Dali Ballard, Tony Stroud, Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc. and Dail Ballard
Case Number: 7:2021cv00191
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Murguia Arya, Sharon Bellamy, Patrice Benjamin, Madison Bowen, Briahna Comartie, Nicole Emery, Kendall Farrior, Wendy Farrior, Angel Grant, Heather Hinson, Krishanta Jones, Kelly Lantz, Stephanie Pages, Denisha Simmons, Jessica Smith, Venkita Waddell (Hanley, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 36 Notice filed by Murguia Arya, Sharon Bellamy, Patrice Benjamin, Madison Bowen, Briahna Comartie, Nicole Emery, Kendall Farrior, Wendy Farrior, Angel Grant, Heather Hinson, Krishanta Jones, Kelly Lantz, Stephanie Pages, Denisha Simmons, Jessica Smith, Venkita Waddell . (Hanley, Andrew)
December 28, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement by Dail Ballard, Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc., Tony Stroud (McVey, Andrew)
December 6, 2021 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time #33 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including January 3, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/6/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
December 6, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.)
December 3, 2021 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Dail Ballard, Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc., Tony Stroud. (McVey, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Extension) (McVey, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 32 Financial Disclosure Statement by Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc. (McVey, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Kent McVey on behalf of All Defendants. (McVey, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
November 8, 2021 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Dail Ballard, Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc., Tony Stroud. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 29 Financial Disclosure Statement by Wendy Farrior (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by Venkita Waddell (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jessica Smith (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sharon Bellamy (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Pages (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Murguia Arya (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Madison Bowen (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kendall Farrior (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kelly Lantz (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Krishanta Jones (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Heather Hinson (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicole Emery (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Denisha Simmons (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Briahna Comartie (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Patirce Bejamin (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Angel Grant (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Madison Bowen (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Krishanta Jones (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Kendall Farrior (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Lantz (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Smith (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Heather Hinson (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Denisha Simmons (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Denisha Simmons (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Briahna Comartie (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Murguia Arya (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Angel Grant (Hanley, Andrew) Modified on 11/8/2021 to correct docket text. (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew J. Hanley on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hanley, Andrew)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6306248.), filed by Briahna Comartie, Nicole Emery, Madison Bowen, Wendy Farrior, Denisha Simmons, Angel Grant, Stephanie Pages, Murguia Arya, Jessica Smith, Sharon Bellamy, Heather Hinson, Kelly Lantz, Venkita Waddell, Patirce Bejamin, Krishanta Jones, Kendall Farrior. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for Ballard, #3 Proposed Summons Summons for Learning Center, #4 Proposed Summons Summons for Stroud) (Hanley, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrior et al v. Ballard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Farrior
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Bowen
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murguia Arya
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patirce Bejamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Farrior
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Pages
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Emery
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venkita Waddell
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Smith
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishanta Jones
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briahna Comartie
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Bellamy
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisha Simmons
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lantz
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hinson
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Grant
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Benjamin
Represented By: Andrew J. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dali Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Stroud
Represented By: Andrew Kent McVey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Learning Center II of Wilmington, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Kent McVey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dail Ballard
Represented By: Andrew Kent McVey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?