LaBudde v. The Phoenix Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin J. LaBudde
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Casualty Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 7:2021cv00197
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial). Response due by 1/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2021. (Collins, S.)
December 21, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Kevin J. LaBudde (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: CERTIFIED MAIL CARD, #2 Exhibit 2: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY NC DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE) (Ugolick, Rebecca)
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin J. LaBudde. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ugolick, Rebecca) Modified on 12/22/2021 to change docket entry relationship to related motion #15 and revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
December 20, 2021 Filing 17 Notice filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) Corrected Exhibit 2 (previously filed as #15-2). (Niland, Ryan)
December 20, 2021 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Niland, Ryan)
December 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vertex Engineering Report, #2 Corrected at #17 Exhibit 2 - Email regarding Mar 7 2020 Update) (Niland, Ryan) Modified on 12/22/2021 (Collins, S.).
December 1, 2021 Filing 14 Notice filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company regarding #12 Notice of Removal,,,, (Corrected DE12-5 - Exhibit 4 to Complaint). (Niland, Ryan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Phoenix Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Saluta, Gemma)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants (UPDATED) from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 993. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6315832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Homeowners Policy, #3 Exhibit 2- Insurance Claim, #4 Exhibit 3 - Claim Inspection Notice, #5 Corrected and Refiled at DE14 Exhibit 4 - Denial Letter and Estimate, #6 Exhibit 5 - Appeal Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Repair Contract, #8 Exhibit 7 - Mold Removal Invoice, #9 Exhibit 8 - Subject Claim, #10 Exhibit 9 - Inspection Scheduling Notice, #11 Exhibit 10 - Damage Documentation, #12 Exhibit 11 - Damage Documentation, #13 Exhibit 12 - Additional Documentation, #14 Exhibit 13 - Response Regarding Report, #15 Exhibit 14 - Report Regarding Additional Damage, #16 Exhibit 15 - Detailed Email, #17 Exhibit 16 - Engineer Report, #18 Exhibit 17 - Drone Footage, #19 Exhibit 18 - Additional Evidence, #20 Exhibit 19 - Emails Regarding Roofing Estimate, #21 Exhibit 20 - Documentation Regarding Roof, #22 Exhibit 21 - Second Claim Opened, #23 Exhibit 22 - Notice of Nonrenewal, #24 Exhibit 23 - Report Regarding Damage) (Niland, Ryan) Modified on 11/22/2021 (Collins, S.). Modified on 12/1/2021 (Collins, S.).
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court by All Defendants from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 21 CVS 993. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6315832) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Filed in Sampson County) (Niland, Ryan) Modified on 11/19/2021 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Notice filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Casualty Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Saluta, Gemma)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Brooke E. Webber on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Webber, Brooke)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Kevin J. LaBudde (Ugolick, Rebecca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Huffman Ugolick on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ugolick, Rebecca)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Casualty Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America and The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut answer due 12/20/2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/17/2021. A copy of this Order sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Rebecca H. Ugolick of Howard, Stallings, From, Atkins, Angell & Davis, P.A. at P. O. Box 12347, Raleigh, NC 27605 mailed via US Mail on November 18, 2021. (Collins, S.)
November 17, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
November 17, 2021 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Casualty Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Niland, Ryan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Gemma L. Saluta on behalf of All Defendants. (Saluta, Gemma)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Hunter Niland on behalf of All Defendants. (Niland, Ryan)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Rebecca H. Ugolick of Howard, Stallings, From, Atkins, Angell & Davis, P.A. at P. O. Box 12347, Raleigh, NC 27605 mailed via US Mail on November 15, 2021. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Travelers Casualty Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaBudde v. The Phoenix Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. LaBudde
Represented By: Rebecca Huffman Ugolick
Represented By: Brooke E. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Casualty Company
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Gemma L. Saluta
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?