Reaves v. Public Schools of Robeson County et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Juanita Reaves
Defendant: Public Schools of Robeson County, Public Schools of Robeson County Board of Education, Michael Mike Smith, Brenda Fairley-Ferebee, Freddie Williamson, Angela Faulkner, Catherine Truitt, Roy Cooper, Public Schools of North Carolina, North Carolina Department of Public Instruction (NCDPI), North Carolina State Board of Education (SBE) and State of North Carolina
Case Number: 7:2022cv00039
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Referring Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on plaintiff's motion in case number 7:22-CV-39-FL seeking an extension of time to file objections to memorandum and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. For good cause shown, the court grants the motion and allows plaintiff to file objections to the memorandum and recommendation on or before May 31, 2022. Likewise where a similar memorandum and recommendation has been entered in her related case, case number 7:22-CV-40-FL, the court, in its discretion, allows plaintiff an extension of time, to May 31, 2022, to file objections also in that case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/9/2022. A copy of this text order was sent via US mail to Kathy Juanita Reaves, 906 North Smith Street, Mullins, SC 29574 (Collins, S.)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
May 5, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Collins, S.)
May 4, 2022 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #7 MOTION for Disbursements Pursuant to Title IX Violation Against Public Schools of Robeson County, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Collins, S.)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 5/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 4/19/2022. A copy of this M&R was sent via US mail to Kathy Juanita Reaves, 906 North Smith Street, Mullins, SC 29574 (Collins, S.)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Disbursements Pursuant to Title IX Violation Against Public Schools of Robeson County filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 6 Notice Proposed Summons filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Collins, S.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves (Collins, S.)
March 21, 2022 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. All future documents should reflect the revised case number of 7:22-CV-39-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/16/2022. (Copy of order sent to Kathy Juanita Reaves, 906 North Smith Street, Mullins, SC 29574 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauper is filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected documents within fourteen (14) days from the filing of this order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/15/2022. (Copy of order and forms sent to Kathy Juanita Reaves, 906 North Smith Street, Mullins, SC 29574 via US Mail.) (Waddell, K.)
March 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Kathy Juanita Reaves. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 14, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Kathy Juanita Reaves. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. Public Schools of Robeson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Juanita Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Schools of Robeson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Schools of Robeson County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mike Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Fairley-Ferebee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Schools of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Public Instruction (NCDPI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Board of Education (SBE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?