McLaughlin et al v. Onslow County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: joseph robert mclaughlin, lori ready-digiovanni and juan carlos beltran
Defendant: onslow county board of elections, jason dedmond, michael a morgan, laura deptola, john moore, stephanie moser, Marcia Wright, City of Jacksonville, North Carolina, Mayor Sammy Phillips, brian h jackson, logan sosa, cindy edwards, jerry bitner, robert warden, angelia washington, Michael A. Morgan and Brian H. Jackson
Case Number: 7:2022cv00171
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 43 Financial Disclosure Statement by Angelia Washington (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 42 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Warden (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 41 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jerry Bitner (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 40 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cindy Edwards (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 39 Financial Disclosure Statement by Logan Sosa (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 38 Financial Disclosure Statement by Brian H. Jackson (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 37 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sammy Phillips (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 36 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Jacksonville, North Carolina (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow on behalf of Jerry Bitner, City of Jacksonville, North Carolina, Cindy Edwards, Brian H. Jackson, Sammy Phillips, Logan Sosa, Robert Warden, Angelia Washington. (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Caroline P. Mackie on behalf of Jerry Bitner, City of Jacksonville, North Carolina, Cindy Edwards, Brian H. Jackson, Sammy Phillips, Logan Sosa, Robert Warden, Angelia Washington. (Mackie, Caroline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance filed by Edwin M. Speas, Jr on behalf of Jerry Bitner, City of Jacksonville, North Carolina, Cindy Edwards, Brian H. Jackson, Sammy Phillips, Logan Sosa, Robert Warden, Angelia Washington. (Speas, Edwin)
October 12, 2022 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Onslow County Board of Elections. Onslow County Board of Elections waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Laura Deptola. Laura Deptola waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by John Moore. John Moore waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Stephanie Moser. Stephanie Moser waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Marcia Wright. Marcia Wright waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Michael A. Morgan. Michael A. Morgan waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Jason Dedmond. Jason Dedmond waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Marcia Wright (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Stephanie Moser (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by John Moore (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Laura Deptola (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Michael A. Morgan (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Dedmond (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Onslow County Board of Elections (Morgan, James)
October 12, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by James R. Morgan, Jr on behalf of Jason Dedmond, Laura Deptola, John Moore, Michael A. Morgan, Stephanie Moser, Onslow County Board of Elections, Marcia Wright. (Morgan, James)
October 6, 2022 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Angelia Washington waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Robert Warden waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Jerry Bitner waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Cindy Edwards waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Logan Sosa waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Brian H. Jackson waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. Sammy Phillips waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Lori Ready-Digiovanni, Joseph Robert McLaughlin, Juan Carlos Beltran. City of Jacksonville, North Carolina waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Hunter, Robert)
September 30, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jerry Bitner, City of Jacksonville, North Carolina, Jason Dedmond, Laura Deptola, Cindy Edwards, Brian H. Jackson, John Moore, Michael A. Morgan, Stephanie Moser, Onslow County Board of Elections, Sammy Phillips, Logan Sosa, Robert Warden, Angelia Washington, Marcia Wright. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 Notice filed by juan carlos beltran, joseph robert mclaughlin, lori ready-digiovanni CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by juan carlos beltran (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by lori ready-digiovanni (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by joseph robert mclaughlin (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 Notice filed by juan carlos beltran, joseph robert mclaughlin, lori ready-digiovanni Summonses to be Issued. (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6751490.), filed by lori ready-digiovanni, joseph robert mclaughlin, juan carlos beltran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - McLaughlin Voter Registration, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Ready-DiGiovanni Voter Registration, #3 Exhibit A-3 - Beltran Voter Registration, #4 Exhibit B - Certification by City Clerk, #5 Exhibit C - 2022 Representation Map for City of Jacksonville, #6 Exhibit D-1 - 2017 General Election, #7 Exhibit D-2 - 2019 General Election, #8 Exhibit D-3 - 2022 General Election, #9 Exhibit E - McLaughlin Statement and Map) (Hunter, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert G. McIver on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McIver, Robert)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Neal Hunter, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hunter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin et al v. Onslow County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: joseph robert mclaughlin
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: lori ready-digiovanni
Represented By: Robert G. McIver
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: juan carlos beltran
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Robert G. McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: onslow county board of elections
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jason dedmond
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: michael a morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: laura deptola
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: john moore
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: stephanie moser
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Wright
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Jacksonville, North Carolina
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Sammy Phillips
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: brian h jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: logan sosa
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cindy edwards
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerry bitner
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: robert warden
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: angelia washington
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Morgan
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian H. Jackson
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?