Douse v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: James Nathaniel Douse
Defendant: United States of America and Department of the Navy
Case Number: 7:2022cv00176
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Filing 18 Document: Duplicate of #16 Motion to Supplement Record filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Nature of Suit - Screen Shot of EDNC website, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Supplement the Record; granting #15 Motion to Supplement the Record; granting #16 Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/16/2022. Sent to James Nathaniel Douse at 11523 Palmbrush Trail Unit 138 Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 16, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Supplement the Record - With Original Pleading of Camp Lejeune Toxic Water Lawsuit for Relief Supported by Evidence filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Nature of Suite - Screen Shot of EDNC website, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 8, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #15 MOTION to Supplement the Record - With Original Pleading of Camp Lejeune Toxic Water Lawsuit for Relief Supported by Evidence. (Sellers, N.)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Supplement the Record - With Original Pleading of Camp Lejeune Toxic Water Lawsuit for Relief Supported by Evidence filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet - VI: Nature of Suit, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 7, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #14 MOTION to Supplement the Record - With Original Pleading of Camp Lejeune Toxic Water Lawsuit for Relief Supported by Evidence. (Sellers, N.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Supplement the Record - With Original Pleading of Camp Lejeune Toxic Water Lawsuit for Relief Supported by Evidence filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet from 1:12-cv-1771-JOF, #2 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by James Nathaniel Douse served on The United States of America on 10/26/2022. (Sellers, N.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by James Nathaniel Douse served on The Department of the Navy on 10/26/2022. (Sellers, N.)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by James Nathaniel Douse served on United States Attorney's Office, Eastern District of North Carolina on 10/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #6 Motion to Revise Summonses, Revise Relief Sought, Revise Defendant Counsel's Name and Address; denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 10/28/2022. Sent to James Nathaniel Douse at 11523 Palmbrush Trail Unit 138 Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 Notice regarding #8 Summons Issued as to USA and Plaintiff's responsibility to serve. Sent to James Nathaniel Douse at 11523 Palmbrush Trail Unit 138 Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202. (Sellers, N.)
October 20, 2022 Filing 8 Summonses Issued as to Department of the Navy, United States of America, U.S. Attorney. (Sellers, N.)
October 20, 2022 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically, #6 MOTION to Revise Summonses, Revise Relief Sought, Revise Defendant Counsel's Name and Address. (Sellers, N.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Sellers, N.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Revise Summonses, Revise Relief Sought, Revise Defendant Counsel's Name and Address filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Prescribed Medications, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to plaintiff requesting summonses for all the necessary parties that are required to be served. Sent to James Nathaniel Douse at 11523 Palmbrush Trail Unit 138 Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Summons issued at intake) (Rudd, D.)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Rudd, D.)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Rudd, D.)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of the Navy, United States of America (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number WIL002435.), filed by James Nathaniel Douse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Camp Lejeune/Camp Geiger Maps of Affected Areas, #2 Exhibit Copy of Discharge DD-214, #3 Exhibit SF-95 Denial of Administrative Claim from the Judge Advocate, #4 Exhibit Information regarding the Water Contamination at Marine Corps Base Camp Lejeune, #5 Exhibit Chapter 99B - Product Liability, #6 Exhibit General Assembly of North Carolina - Senate Bill 574, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douse v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Nathaniel Douse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?