Foye v. Lassiter et al
Plaintiff: Maurkice Foye and Maurkice Dock Foye
Defendant: Matthew F. Lassiter and Robeson County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 7:2023cv00009
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Rule 26(f) Report (individual) filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Plaintiff's motions at DE #6 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #16 , #19 , and #20 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/1/2023. A copy of this Order has been sent via US mail to Maurkice Dock Foye at 3525 E. Elizabethtown Rd., TRL 114, Lumberton, NC 28358 (Collins, S.)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Rule 26(f) Report (individual) filed by Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office. (Flanagan, Patrick)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Speedy Trial - Case Handling filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Defendant to Answer in More Detail filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 MOTION Outlining All Exhibits, #10 MOTION to Disclose Consent Form, #12 MOTION to Discuss ADR, #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #14 MOTION For the Record, #16 MOTION for BodyCam and Car Footage, #11 MOTION to Disclose Information. (Collins, S.)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 3/8/23. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/30/2023. A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Maurkice Dock Foye at 3525 E. Elizabethtown Rd., TRL 114, Lumberton, NC 28358 (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Document: Detailed Summary of What Happened on 10/6/21 filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Attachments: #1 Rights Actually Violated, #2 Incident Report) (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for BodyCam and Car Footage filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE regarding #8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION For the Record filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION Outlining All Exhibits filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Discuss ADR filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Disclose Information filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Disclose Consent Form filed by Maurkice Dock Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office. (Flanagan, Patrick)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office. (Flanagan, Patrick)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office (Flanagan, Patrick)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Maurkice Foye. (Attachments: #1 Copies of criminal file) (Collins, S.)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Maurkice Foye (Collins, S.)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Maurkice Foye. (Collins, S.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick H. Flanagan on behalf of Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office. (Flanagan, Patrick)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self-Representation and Financial Disclosure Statement sent to pro se plaintiff, Maurkice Foye at 3525 E Elizabethtown Road, Trl 114, Lumberton, NC 28358. Along with the notice a blank Notice of Self-Representation and Financial Disclosure Statement mailed via US Mail on January 18, 2023. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Matthew F. Lassiter, Robeson County Sheriff's Office. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, [1-2] Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" (the civil cover sheet and the supplemental removal cover sheet) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Robeson County Superior Court, case number 22 CVS 3334. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-6902698), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- Civil Summons, #5 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Indigency , #6 Exhibit D- Petition to Proceed as Indigent, #7 Exhibit E- Notice of Removal to Robeson County Superior Court) (Flanagan, Patrick) Modified on 1/18/2023 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foye v. Lassiter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurkice Foye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurkice Dock Foye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew F. Lassiter
Represented By: Patrick H. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robeson County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Patrick H. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?