Safe Harbor Insurance Company v. Milam et al
Plaintiff: Safe Harbor Insurance Company
Defendant: Jason Milam Individually doing business as Milam Plumbing, Inc., Logan Developers, Inc. and Jason Milam Individually and d/b/a Milam Plumbing, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2023cv01219
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Robert B Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Leonard Pinto on behalf of Logan Developers, Inc.. (Pinto, Richard)
October 4, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
October 4, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Logan Developers, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including October 27, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/4/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Logan Developers, Inc.. (Pinto, Andrew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew G. Pinto on behalf of Logan Developers, Inc.. (Pinto, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason Milam. (Seelbach, Robin)
October 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jason Milam. (Seelbach, Robin)
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Safe Harbor Insurance Company. Jason Milam waiver sent on 9/11/2023, answer due 11/10/2023. (Falls, Henry)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safe Harbor Insurance Company. Logan Developers, Inc. served on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. (Falls, Henry)
September 18, 2023 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Milam's Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant Milam has up to and including October 2, 2023, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/18/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
September 18, 2023 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Robin A. Seelbach on behalf of Jason Milam. (Seelbach, Robin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Milam (Skinner, Christopher)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Jason Milam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint) (Skinner, Christopher)
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher James Skinner on behalf of Jason Milam. (Skinner, Christopher)
August 30, 2023 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Safe Harbor Insurance Company served on Jason William Milam, Individually on August 19, 2023. (Falls, Henry)
August 15, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Logan Developers, Inc., Jason Milam. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2023 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Safe Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RM Ocean Harbor Holding, Inc. for Safe Harbor Insurance Company. (Falls, Henry)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by David C. Boggs on behalf of Safe Harbor Insurance Company. (Boggs, David)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry Lee Falls, III on behalf of Safe Harbor Insurance Company. (Falls, Henry)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7224451.), filed by Safe Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Jason William Milam, Individually, #3 Proposed Summons for Jason William Milam d/b/a Milam Plumbing, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons for Logan Developers, Inc. t/a Logan Construction Company) (Falls, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safe Harbor Insurance Company v. Milam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safe Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: David C. Boggs
Represented By: Henry Lee Falls, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Milam Individually doing business as Milam Plumbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Developers, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Leonard Pinto
Represented By: Andrew G. Pinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Milam Individually and d/b/a Milam Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Skinner
Represented By: Robin A. Seelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?